Hansen v. Musk et al
Plaintiff: Karl Hansen
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc., U.S. Securities Associates, Inc., Elon Musk and Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00413
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Craig S Denney
2 Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting ECF No. #58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Attorney Anne V. Dunne withdrawn as counsel for Defedants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 6, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY A. DUNNE by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Robertson, Christopher) Modified on 5/6/2022 changed entry from notice to a motion per LR IA 11-6(b) (WJ).
January 27, 2022 Filing 57 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
January 25, 2022 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:19-cv-00413-LRH-CSD. (no image attached) (HKL)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - The Tesla Parties' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings (ECF No. #39 ) is GRANTED. Count I as to the Tesla Parties is dismissed without prejudice because the parties are compelled to arbitrate.The USSA's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss Count II, and Stay Judicial Proceedings (ECF No. #44 ) is GRANTED.Count III of Hansen's Complaint is STAYED pending arbitration. Within 10 days of the issuance of the Arbitration Court's decision, the parties shall file a notice with the Court and a motion to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER approving ECF No. #53 Stipulation to Stay Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 4, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION To Stay Pretrial Deadlines by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Crane)
May 1, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF #49 Reply : Docket Text Modified to denote that the wrong event was used for docketing. The identical document has been correctly e-filed as ECF #50 Response. (no image attached) (DRM)
May 1, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #48 Motion to Compel,, by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. Replies due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Janine M. Braxton in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) (Smith, Alexandra)
May 1, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #48 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. Replies due by 5/8/2020. (Pomerantz, Crane)
May 1, 2020 Filing 49 E-FILING ERROR - SEE ECF NO. #50 FOR CORRECTLY E-FILED DOCKET ENTRY : REPLY to Response to #48 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Crane) Modified on 5/1/2020 to denote filing error(DRM).
April 17, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. Responses due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas Woodfield, #3 Exhibit a.Ex. A Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendants, #4 Exhibit b.Ex. B Plaintiffs First Requests for Production to Defendants, #5 Exhibit c.Ex. C Tesla Parties response to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests to Defendants, #6 Exhibit d.Ex. D USSAs Responses to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendants, #7 Exhibit e.Ex. E USSAs Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production to Defendants) (Woodfield, Nicholas)
April 14, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to #39 Motion, by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Smith, Alexandra)
April 10, 2020 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #45 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised that QC made the necessary correction to ECF No. #45 . Counsel further advised that counsel should start using the appropriate docket entry title or call clerk's office for assistance in selecting the proper event. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 7, 2020 Filing 45 OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM to #44 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. (Woodfield, Nicholas) Modified on 4/10/2020 document is a oppo. (WJ).
March 27, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Janine M. Braxton in Support of Defendant U.S. Security Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss and Stay Proceeding) (Smith, Alexandra)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re #42 Stipulation. Discovery due by 7/25/2020. Motions due by 8/24/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 20, 2020 Filing 42 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Crane)
March 17, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #39 Motion, by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits) (Pomerantz, Crane)
March 10, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #39 Motion, by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. Replies due by 3/17/2020. (Woodfield, Nicholas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit B to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit C to Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Pomerantz, Crane)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving ECF No. #37 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas W. Woodfield and approving Designation of Local Counsel by Joshua D. Buck. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas W. Woodfield and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joshua D. Buck (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5900724) by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex B. Courts Admitted to Practice) (Buck, Joshua)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER approving ECF No. #35 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Joshua D. Buck, Mark R. Thierman, and Leah L. Jones for Plaintiff. Daniel R. Watkins and Eran S. Foster terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 19, 2020 Filing 35 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joshua Buck in for Attorney Daniel R. Watkins by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. (Buck, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting ECF No. #31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra A. Smith for U.S. Security Associates, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting ECF No. #30 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy T. Naftel for U.S. Security Associates, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ECF No. #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Janine M. Braxton for U.S. Security Associates, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra A. Smith and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Cecil (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819154) by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Cecil, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy T. Naftel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Cecil (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819149) by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Cecil, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Janine M. Braxton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Cecil (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819136) by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Cecil, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LH)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No. #26 Joint Case Management. Discovery due by 5/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Karl Hansen (Ortuno, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Alex A. Smith to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/28/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Janine M. Braxton to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/28/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeremy T. Naftel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/28/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #19 . Attorney Jordan Walsh is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #19 . Attorney Dora V. Lane is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cecil, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by U.S. Securities Associates, Inc..(Cecil, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne V. Dunne for Eldon Musk, Tesla Motors Inc., Tesla Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Crane Pomerantz. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/28/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Christpher F. Robertson is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 11/15/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc's answer/response due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER approving ECF No. #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher F. Robertson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Crane M. Pomerantz. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.. (Cecil, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher F. Robertson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Crane M. Pomerantz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5745666) by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Crane)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anne V. Dunne and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Crane M. Pomerantz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5745623) by Defendants Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Crane)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Hansen re #3 Summons Issued. U.S. Securities Associates, Inc. served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Ortuno, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Karl Hansen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ortuno, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Anne V. Dunne to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/4/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher F. Robertson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/4/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karl Hansen. Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Watkins, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Hansen re #3 Summons Issued. Tesla, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Watkins, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Pomerantz, Crane)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2019.(Pomerantz, Crane) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No. #1 Complaint, ECF No. #2 Proposed Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tesla Inc, #2 Summons Tesla Inc, #3 Summons U.S. Security Associates) (KR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Elon Musk by Plaintiff Karl Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tesla, Inc, #2 Summons Tesla Motors, Inc, #3 Summons U.S. Security Associates)(Watkins, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5630829) by Karl Hansen. Proof of service due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. Musk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher F Robertson
Represented By: Anne Virginia Dunne
Represented By: Crane M Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Securities Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Naftel
Represented By: S. Jordan Walsh
Represented By: Alexandra A. Smith
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Janine Braxton
Represented By: Matthew T. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Represented By: Christopher F Robertson
Represented By: Anne Virginia Dunne
Represented By: Crane M Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher F Robertson
Represented By: Anne Virginia Dunne
Represented By: Crane M Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Hansen
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Represented By: Eran Scott Forster
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Eran S Forster
Represented By: Joseph Ortuno
Represented By: Nicholas Wyckoff Woodfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?