Evans v. Lander County Hospital District d/b/a Battle Mountain General Hospital
Plaintiff: Todd P Evans
Defendant: Lander County Hospital District
Case Number: 3:2019cv00464
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LH)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #10 Stipulation. Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Todd P Evans. (Schrager, Bradley)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Todd P Evans. Replies due by 9/17/2019. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Lander County Hospital District. Responses due by 9/11/2019. (Mercado, Alice)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lander County Hospital District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mercado, Alice)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lander County Hospital District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/12/2019.(Mercado, Alice) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd P Evans re #4 Summons Issued. Lander County Hospital District served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lander County Hospital District re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Todd P Evans. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Todd P Evans. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schrager, Bradley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Todd P Evans (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5654538) by Todd P Evans. Proof of service due by 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrager, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Lander County Hospital District d/b/a Battle Mountain General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lander County Hospital District
Represented By: Sarah Marie Molleck
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd P Evans
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?