Walker v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Evan Walker
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc. and Tesla Motors NV, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00470
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Evan Walker. (Mausert, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evan Walker re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Tesla Motors NV, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evan Walker re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Tesla Motors, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Tesla Motors NV, Inc., Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Tesla Motors, Inc., #2 Tesla Motors NV, Inc.) (LH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Evan Walker. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mausert, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for ENE. (WJ)
August 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5659680) by Evan Walker. Proof of service due by 11/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mausert, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors NV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Walker
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?