Wegman v. Johnson's Carson City RV
Plaintiff: Karmelle E. Wegman
Defendant: Johnson's Carson City RV and Johnson's Carson City RV Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00486
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. #7 -1 Stipulated Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRM)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Stipulation : Discovery due by 3/9/2020. Motions due by 4/8/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Karmelle E. Wegman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (Geddes, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Johnson's Carson City RV Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Butterfield, Chad)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Johnson's Carson City RV Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/25/2019.(Butterfield, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karmelle E. Wegman re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Johnson's Carson City RV Inc served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Geddes, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristen R. Geddes on behalf of Plaintiff Karmelle E. Wegman. (Geddes, Kristen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson's Carson City RV Inc re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
August 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for ENE. (LE)
August 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson's Carson City RV (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5662852) by Karmelle E. Wegman. Proof of service due by 11/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Certificateof Interested Parties)(Geddes, William) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wegman v. Johnson's Carson City RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson's Carson City RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson's Carson City RV Inc
Represented By: Chad C. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karmelle E. Wegman
Represented By: William J. Geddes
Represented By: Kristen R. Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?