United States of America v. 9mm machinegun manufactured by Parabellum Combat Systems/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PCS-9, Serial No. 50799, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Parabellum Combat Systems/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PCS-9, Serial No. 50799, et al, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MAG58, Serial No. MAG1131, .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Heckler & Koch/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model HK93, Serial No. 507, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Group Industries/Silver Bullet Gun Works (bolt), Model UZI, Serial No. 790111, .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by D.S. Arms Inc., Model M249, Serial No. SAW007, 8mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MG34, Serial No. 8904, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M60, Serial No. M1302, .308 caliber machinegun manufactured by Leonard, Benny W; Benny Leonard, Model MG42, Serial No. 1924;, .303 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model BRENMK1, Serial No. SMG12-028, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model STERLINGSPO, Serial No. WLA210-C04185, .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Bushmaster/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model XM15E2S, Serial No. L420020, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by SAS Products, Model PKM, Serial No. BE412, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model KRINKOV, Serial No. KL507, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by silver Bullet Gun Works, Model AK-47, Serial No. 013118, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model AUSA, Serial No. AA5654, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model PPS43C, Serial No. KT01312P, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by JCD Tactical Law Enforcement Sales, Model 1919A4, Serial No. JCDA4-001, 9mm machinegun manufactured by MK Arms/Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model MK760, Serial No. C0067, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model NDS1948, Serial No. IDF0502, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model DP28, Serial No. SMG10-DP041, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M31SA, Serial No. H002448, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PPSH-41, Serial No. 417, 8mm machinegun manufactured by William D Bowman Law Enforcement Technology/LET, Model MADSEN1904, Serial No. 523, 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model RPD, Serial No. 0218, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Glock/Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model 19, Serial No. YDE825, 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M45, Serial No. K1308, 5.45 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model AUSA, Serial No. AA5597, .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Heckler & Koch/silver Bullet Gun Works, Model MP5, Serial No. 009, .30 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M2, Serial No. J7001, .45 caliber machinegun manufactured by William D Bowman Law Encorcement Technology/LET, Model M1A1 Serial No. 1002, 5.56 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MARCK15, Serial No. 30090, .308 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model L1A1SPORTER, Serial No. 124852 and 9mm machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model SIG MPX, Serial No. 103117
Case Number: 3:2019cv00496
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONSES and Warrants of Arrest in Rem for the Property as to All Defendants. (LH)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Summonses and Warrants of Arrest in Rem for the Property re ECF No. #2 Motion to Enforce IRS Summons. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Summonses and Warrants of Arrest in Rem and Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. 50799, #2 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. 790111, #3 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. YDE825, #4 Summons.223 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 009, #5 Summons.223 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 507, #6 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. 417, #7 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. C0067, #8 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 013118, #9 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. KL507, #10 Summons.223 caliber machinegun, Serial No. L420020, #11 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 0218, #12 Summons 8mm machinegun, Serial No. 523, #13 Summons.45 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 1002, #14 Summons.308 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 1924, #15 Summons 8mm machinegun, Serial No. 8904, #16 Summons 5.56 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 30090, #17 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. 103117, #18 Summons.308 caliber machinegun, Serial No. 124852, #19 Summons.223 caliber machinegun, Serial No. SAW007, #20 Summons 5.45 caliber machinegun, Serial No. AA5597, #21 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. AA5654, #22 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. BE412, #23 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. H002448, #24 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. IDF0502, #25 Summons.30 caliber machinegun, Serial No. J7001, #26 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. JCDA4-001, #27 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. K1308, #28 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. M1302, #29 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. MAG1131, #30 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. SMG10-DP041, #31 Summons.303 caliber machinegun, Serial No. SMG12-028, #32 Summons 9mm machinegun, Serial No. WLA210-C04185, #33 Summons 7.62 caliber machinegun, Serial No. KT01312P)(Blum, James) Modified on 8/19/2019 changed event to a motion (LE).
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against 9mm machinegun manufactured by Parabellum Combat Systems/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PCS-9, Serial No. 50799, et al by United States of America. Proof of service due by 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blum, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 9mm machinegun manufactured by Parabellum Combat Systems/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PCS-9, Serial No. 50799, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Parabellum Combat Systems/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PCS-9, Serial No. 50799, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MAG58, Serial No. MAG1131
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Heckler & Koch/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model HK93, Serial No. 507
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Group Industries/Silver Bullet Gun Works (bolt), Model UZI, Serial No. 790111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by D.S. Arms Inc., Model M249, Serial No. SAW007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MG34, Serial No. 8904
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M60, Serial No. M1302
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .308 caliber machinegun manufactured by Leonard, Benny W; Benny Leonard, Model MG42, Serial No. 1924;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .303 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model BRENMK1, Serial No. SMG12-028
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model STERLINGSPO, Serial No. WLA210-C04185
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Bushmaster/ Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model XM15E2S, Serial No. L420020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by SAS Products, Model PKM, Serial No. BE412
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model KRINKOV, Serial No. KL507
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by silver Bullet Gun Works, Model AK-47, Serial No. 013118
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model AUSA, Serial No. AA5654
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model PPS43C, Serial No. KT01312P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by JCD Tactical Law Enforcement Sales, Model 1919A4, Serial No. JCDA4-001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by MK Arms/Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model MK760, Serial No. C0067
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model NDS1948, Serial No. IDF0502
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model DP28, Serial No. SMG10-DP041
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M31SA, Serial No. H002448
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model PPSH-41, Serial No. 417
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8mm machinegun manufactured by William D Bowman Law Enforcement Technology/LET, Model MADSEN1904, Serial No. 523
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.62 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model RPD, Serial No. 0218
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Glock/Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model 19, Serial No. YDE825
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M45, Serial No. K1308
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.45 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model AUSA, Serial No. AA5597
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .223 caliber machinegun manufactured by Heckler & Koch/silver Bullet Gun Works, Model MP5, Serial No. 009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .30 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model M2, Serial No. J7001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .45 caliber machinegun manufactured by William D Bowman Law Encorcement Technology/LET, Model M1A1 Serial No. 1002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.56 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model MARCK15, Serial No. 30090
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .308 caliber machinegun manufactured by Jaco Sales Co. LLC, Model L1A1SPORTER, Serial No. 124852
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9mm machinegun manufactured by Silver Bullet Gun Works, Model SIG MPX, Serial No. 103117
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Alexander Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?