Rogers v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Douglas Rogers
Defendant: Kirsten, Mr. Baca, Pervis and Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv00503
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Elijah Douglas Rogers. Old: NNCC. New: WSCC. (LH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #3 Order, addressed to Elijah Douglas Rogers. (LH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Elijah Douglas Rogers. (LH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Elijah Douglas Rogers. (KR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Elijah Douglas Rogers. Old: 1903916, Washoe County Detention Center. New: 1180277, NNCC. (KR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Clerk send Plaintiff the approved IFP form by a prisoner and instructions (Mailed to P on 8/19/2019); Fully complete IFP application or $400 filing fee due by 9/18/2019; if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; the Clerk will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1), but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE: No IFP Application, or Filing Fee was received with Initiating Documents, filed by Elijah Douglas Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Declaration) (LH)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Douglas Rogers
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?