Robins v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: Damian Robins and Damien Robins
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Warden William Gittere and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Damien Robins. (DRM)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Petitioner's motion for extension of time: Petitioner will have up to and including Monday, November 4, 2019, to file an amended petition and to either file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE RESPONSE re ECF No. #3 Order, by Petitioner Damien Robins. (DRM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time re ECF No. #3 Order, by Petitioner Damien Robins. (DRM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents William Gittere, Nevada Attorney General. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Procter, Heather)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Damien Robins. (File and denied pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.)(DRM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Damien Robins. (Filed and e-service upon AG pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.)(DRM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - ECF No. #1 IFP Application is denied without prejudice. Petitioner must file another IFP application accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account, or pay the $5.00 filing fee, by 9/19/2019. Clerk shall send Petitioner a blank IFP application form for incarcerated litigants. (Mailed to P 8/20/2019.) Clerk shall file the petition, and the motion for counsel. Clerk shall send P 2254 form and instructions. (Mailed to P 8/20/2019) "AMENDED" petition due by 9/19/2019. Petitioner shall show cause by 9/19/2019 why the Court should not dismiss this action as untimely. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Clerk shall change Petitioner's first name from "Damian" to "Damien" on the docket. Clerk add AG as counsel for Respondents. Clerk e-serve Respondents a copy of the petition and this order. (E-service 8/20/2019.) Respondents' counsel must enter a notice of appearance herein by 9/10/2019, but no further response will be required from Respondents until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Gittere, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00506-MMD-CBC. (DRM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Damian Robins. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC., #2 Motion for Counsel)(DRM)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robins v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden William Gittere
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damian Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damien Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?