Connors v. Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Clark
Plaintiff: William John Connors, III
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Clark and Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada
Case Number: 3:2019cv00525
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/18/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, November 8, 2019, in which to file a completed IFP application or pay the filing fee as well as file an amended complaint pursuant to the court's order of August 27, 2019 (ECF No. #3 ). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re ECF No. #3 Order, by Plaintiff William John Connors, III. (DRM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/24/2019. Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #5 . Plaintiff requests an extension of twenty (20) days in which to comply with the court's Order of August 27, 2019 #3 .Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, October 18, 2019, in which to file a completed IFP application or pay the filing fee as well as file an amended complaint pursuant to the court's order of August 27, 2019 #3 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time, re ECF No. #3 Order, by Plaintiff William John Connors, III. (DRM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A, filed by Plaintiff William John Connors III. (KR)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff IFP form and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC law library.) IFP application or $400 filing fee due by 9/26/2019. Plaintiff's petition (ECF No. 1-1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff a copy of both the instructions and form for filing a 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition, as well as the 1983 civil rights complaint packet. ( Forms attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC law library.) Amended complaint, petition, or civil right complaint due by 9/26/2019.OR Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form & Instructions, #2 2254 Form & Instructions, #3 1983 Form & Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KR)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff William John Connors, III. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Review, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Financial Certificate Request and Certificate) (KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connors v. Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada in and for the County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William John Connors, III
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?