Champery Rental Reo, LLC v. Polson et al
Plaintiff: Champery Rental Reo, LLC
Defendant: Adam W Polson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv00529
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Boris Kukso on behalf of Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Kukso, Boris)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Champery Rental Reo, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2019. (Schriever, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/17/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Out-of-state and out-of-town counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19529. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, December 23, 2019. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Champery Rental Reo, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schriever, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Pleadings Filed in State Court) (Lowe, Virginia)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adam W Polson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lehners, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, First Amended Complaint filed by Internal Revenue Service. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019.(Lowe, Virginia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Lowe, Virginia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/10/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Krista J. Nielson is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, Nevada, Case Number CV19-00869, by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 First Amended Complaint)(Lowe, Virginia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champery Rental Reo, LLC v. Polson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam W Polson
Represented By: Michael C. Lehners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Krista Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champery Rental Reo, LLC
Represented By: Casey Joel Nelson
Represented By: Matthew K Schriever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?