Gingold et al v. Itronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold and Nahal Kedumim, LLC
Defendant: John W. Whitney and Itronics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00532
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/2/2020. On September 1, 2020, Todd Alexander, Esq. entered an appearance on behalf of plaintiffs, Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold, and Nahal Kedumim, LLC (ECF No. #37 ) and such appearance is hereby deemed timely filed. Therefore, plaintiffs' motions ECF Nos. #32 & #33 ) are DENIED as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd R. Alexander on behalf of Plaintiffs Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold, Nahal Kedumim, LLC. (Alexander, Todd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 36 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. (DRM)
August 9, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response (ECF No. #34 ) re ECF Nos. #32 / #33 Motions, by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
August 3, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #32 Motion by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. Replies due by 8/10/2020. (Wicker, W.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Extend Time re ECF No. #31 Minute Order by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. (Same PDF image as ECF No. #32 Motion). (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Transfer Interests by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
June 29, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/29/2020, directing Plaintiff Nahal Kedumim LLC to file a substitution of counsel on or before 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Harry Gingold. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Image of Envelope) (LW)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 CONSENT for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Monique Gingold. (AB)
May 11, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Itronics, Inc..(Wicker, W.)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED that Itronic's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #7 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Plaintiff Harry Gingold's motion for leave to amend the Complaint (ECF No. #17 ) is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 18, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Harry Gingold and Monique Gingold; Def Counsel: Chris Wicker and Kelsey Gunderson; Recording start and end times: 9:00:48 - 9:12:08; Courtroom: 1; The Court finds the settlement conference currently set for March 26, 2020 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and shall be rescheduled at a later date. The Court encourages Mr. Wicker to submit an offer to the plaintiffs by March 23, 2020 so that the parties can try to informally settle this case. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/17/2020. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A telephonic status conference regarding the upcoming settlement conference is set for 3/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The parties shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19532. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 EXECUTION ADDENDUM to ECF No. #21 Case Management Report, by Plaintiffs Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (DRM)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The settlement conference statements shall be received in chambers, 400 S. Virginia Street, Suite 404, no later than Thursday, March 19, 2020 by 4:00 p.m. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/24/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Harry Gingold; Def Counsel: Chris Wicker; Recording start and end times: 10:02:27 - 10:23:13; Courtroom: 1; The Court advises Mr. Gingold that he can represent himself in this case; however, that he is not permitted to represent Monique Gingold or Nahal Kedumim, LLC in this action. The Court finds that it will adopt the agreed upon deadlines as outlined in the parties' case management report #21 ; however, since not all plaintiffs signed the report, those plaintiffs have leave to file an objection. The following deadlines shall govern this action: Discovery due 5/4/2020, Dispositive Motions due 6/3/2020 and the Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due 7/6/2020. A settlement conference is set for March 26, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiffs, Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold, and Nahal Kedumim, LLC, and by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wicker, W.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to ECF No. #19 Response to ECF No. #17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Addendum to Response, by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (LH)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #17 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wicker, W.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/20/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Plaintiffs shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19532. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Friday, January 10, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Addendum to Response (ECF No. #12 ), by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Addendum to Plaintiff's Response)(AB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #14 , #15 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 ADDENDUM to #13 Reply, by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wicker, W.) Modified on 12/5/2019 add link to motion #7 (WJ).
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 ERRATA to #13 Reply, by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. (Wicker, W.) Modified on 12/5/2019 add link to motion #7 (WJ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Doug Brown in Support of the Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Wicker, W.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to ECF No. #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Harry Gingold. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (LH)
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S AMENDED NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IA 11-1 and IC 2-1. Attorney Kelsey E. Gunderson is in violation of Local Rule IA 11-1 failure to register as a member of this Court bar and IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are also required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for membership to the Court bar and for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 12/5/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IA 11-1 and IC 2-1. Attorney Kelsey E. Gunderson is in violation of Local Rule IA 11-1 failure to register as a member of this Court bar and IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are also required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 12/5/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2019, regarding the requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #7 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Wicker, W.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants Itronics, Inc., John W. Whitney. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Whitney, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (redacted), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (redacted), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Wicker, W.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Harry Gingold. Itronics Inc served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; John W. Whitney served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed) (KR)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed/ /Declarations of Service filed by Harry Gingold re ECF No. #1 -2 Summons issued. Itronics, Inc. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019; John W. Whitney served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (LH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted/Declarations of Non-Service - Unable to effect service as to Itronics, Inc., and as to John W. Whitney. (Attachments: #1 as to John W. Whitney)(DRM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 PAID - Receipt No. NVRNO004676) by Harry Gingold, Monique Gingold. Proof of service due by 11/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Issued Summonses, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Declaration, #5 Contact Information)(LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gingold et al v. Itronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Gingold
Represented By: Todd R. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Gingold
Represented By: Todd R. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahal Kedumim, LLC
Represented By: Todd R. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Whitney
Represented By: Kelsey E. Gunderson
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itronics, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey E. Gunderson
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?