Battle Born Munitions Inc v. Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Plaintiff: Battle Born Munitions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00561
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mario B. Williams and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Therese M. Shanks (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5767606) by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. (Shanks, Therese)
November 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John M. Shoreman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Therese M. Shanks (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5767595) by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. (Shanks, Therese)
November 6, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/6/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The telephonic case management conference currently set for 12/16/2019 at 2:00 PM is VACATED and ADVANCED to 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry at which time the Court will also hear the defendant's motion to stay discovery #15 and plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery #21 . The parties shall now jointly file a case management report that comports with this Court's order setting case management conference #18 by no later than the close of business on Monday, November 25, 2019. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19561. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion to Enjoin by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gall, Maria)
November 4, 2019 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #18 Minute Order, addressed to Andrew J Petrie. (LH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #21 Motion by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. Replies due by 11/11/2019. (Gall, Maria)
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #29 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 ERRATA to #28 Reply by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) Modified on 11/4/2019 add link to motion #15 .(WJ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Gall, Maria)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew J. Petrie for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Maria A. Gall. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/29/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 NON-OPPOSITION to #17 Motion to Seal by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Gall, Maria)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Petrie and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Maria A. Gall (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5755129) by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Gall, Maria)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mario Williams to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/7/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John Shoreman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/7/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Shanks, Therese)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2019. (Shanks, Therese)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY RESPONSE to #16 Response by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) Modified on 10/24/2019 changed event from response to reply(LE).
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Change Venue, #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Gall, Maria)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/17/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A telephonic case management conference is set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19561. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, December 2, 2019. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. (Shanks, Therese)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Change Venue, #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. Replies due by 10/23/2019. (Shanks, Therese)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Gall, Maria)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackstone Group, Inc. for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. added. (Gall, Maria)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #12 Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney Maria A. Gall advised to refile your certificate of interested parties. Page 2 of document #12 states that there are a parent company and corporate affiliates, i.e. Blackstone Group, Inc and The Vanguard Group, Inc. The certificate of interested party entry has a clear warning in the entry stating: "Please Note: you must add ALL Corporate Parents and/or Corporate Affiliates to the case. Failing to add all interested parties listed on the certificate will result in a notice from the court." Furthermore, LR 7.1-1 (a), in regards to certificate of interested parties, states in part: "These representations are made to enable judges of the Court to evaluate possible disqualifications or recusal. Therefore it is requested that you properly refile your certificate of interested parties. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gall, Maria)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew J. Petrie to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/17/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Gall, Maria)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Gall, Maria) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gall, Maria)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Battle Born Munitions, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Shanks, Therese)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Shanks, Therese)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dick's Sporting Goods Inc re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mario Williams to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/26/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John Shoreman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/26/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5697127) by Battle Born Munitions, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shanks, Therese) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle Born Munitions Inc v. Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battle Born Munitions, Inc.
Represented By: Therese Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?