Nall v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Tyrone T. Nall
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Renee Baker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00563
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Tyrone T. Nall. (Filed and DISMISSED pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.)(DRM)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall detach and file the petition (ECF No. #1 -1). The petition is DISMISSED as set forth herein. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Baker, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00563-LRH-CBC. (DRM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Tyrone T. Nall. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Counsel)(DRM)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nall v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone T. Nall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?