Harris v. Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clarissa Harris
Defendant: Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC, Kamy Keshmiri and Jamy Keshmiri
Case Number: 3:2019cv00598
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC, Jamy Keshmiri, Kamy Keshmiri. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thierman, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC, Jamy Keshmiri, Kamy Keshmiri. Responses due by 11/26/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Thierman, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Ved Chitale is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DRM)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David W. Hodges for Clarissa Harris and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael P. Balaban. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David W. Hodges and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael P. Balaban (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5770790) by Plaintiff Clarissa Harris. (Balaban, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clarissa Harris re #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Balaban, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Clarissa Harris. (Balaban, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ved Chitale to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/10/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint. Attorney Michael P. Balaban advised to review your civil cover sheet. Appears to be a problem with the document when it got filed. Please make the necessary corrections and refile your document. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 10/1/2019 COMPLIED (LE).
September 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Transferring Case to the Unofficial Northern Division. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clarissa Harris. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Clarissa Harris. (Balaban, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5715784) by Clarissa Harris. Proof of service due by 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Dolls of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamy Keshmiri
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamy Keshmiri
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Harris
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Represented By: Ved Chitale
Represented By: David Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?