Cecconi v. Beneficial Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dean Cecconi
Defendant: Beneficial Solutions, LLC and Russell B. Altman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00599
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dean Cecconi. Russell B. Altman waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dean Cecconi. Beneficial Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c); wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Attorney to refile document using the correct event. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Cecconi. Russell B. Altman served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Lagomarsino, Andre) Attorney notified to refile. Document #9 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to L:R IC 7-1 on 10/10/2019 (RFJ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c); wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Attorney to refile document using the correct event. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Cecconi. Beneficial Solutions, LLC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Lagomarsino, Andre) Attorney notified to refile. Document #8 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 10/10/2019 (RFJ).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vincent J. Moccio for Dean Cecconi and approving Designation of Local Counsel Andre Lagomarsino. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dean Cecconi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Russell B. Altman) (DRM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Vincent J. Moccio, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andre M. Lagomarsino, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5718097) by Plaintiff Dean Cecconi. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Vincent J. Moccio to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/11/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5717611) by Dean Cecconi. Proof of service due by 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecconi v. Beneficial Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell B. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Cecconi
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Vincent J. Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?