Great Basin Resource Watch, et al v. US DOI, et al
Plaintiff: Great Basin Resource Watch and Western Shoshone Defense Project
Defendant: Jon D. Sherve, United States Department of Interior, Casey Hammond and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2019cv00661
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/23/2019. Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of the Answer Deadline (ECF No. #15 ) is GRANTED. Federal Defendants have up to and including March 9, 2020 to file their answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Flynn, Roger)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Great Basin Resource Watch that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Flynn, Roger)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) To Answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re #14 Amended Complaint by Defendants Casey Hammond, Jon D. Sherve, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior. (Williams, Michelle-Ann)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Great Basin Resource Watch. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 3/16/2020.(Flynn, Roger)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle-Ann C. Williams on behalf of Defendants Casey Hammond, Jon D. Sherve, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior. (Williams, Michelle-Ann)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Basin Resource Watch re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. All Plaintiffs. (Flynn, Roger)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Roger Flynn on behalf of Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch and approving Designation of Local Counsel Julie Cavanaugh-Bill. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving ECF No. #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey Parsons on behalf of Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch and approving Designation of Local Counsel Julie Cavanaugh-Bill. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Roger Flynn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Julie Cavanaugh-Bill (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5788225) by Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch. (Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Parsons and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Julie Cavanaugh-Bill (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5788211) by Plaintiff Great Basin Resource Watch. (Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Casey Hammond, #2 Summons John D. Sherve, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office) (KR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Great Basin Resource Watch that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey C. Parsons to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/15/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Roger Flynn to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/15/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5758430) by Great Basin Resource Watch. Proof of service due by 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons William Barr, #2 Summons Casey Hammond, #3 Summons Jon Sherve, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cavanaugh-Bill, Julie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 31, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Basin Resource Watch, et al v. US DOI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon D. Sherve
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Hammond
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Basin Resource Watch
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Julie Cavanaugh-Bill
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Shoshone Defense Project
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Julie Cavanaugh-Bill,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?