Miller v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Clifford W. Miller
Respondent: Nevada, State of, Nevada Attorney General and Jack Palmer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00673
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Clifford W. Miller. (AB)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Remittitur from the Supreme Court of the State of Nevada, by Clifford W. Miller. (AB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number NVRNO004806 (no image attached) (LH)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re Filing Fee Payments, by Clifford W. Miller. (AB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Clifford W. Miller. Adds and removes parties. (LH)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - "FIRST AMENDED" petition due within 30 days of this order (12/21/2019). Clerk will mail P two blank copies of the form petition for writ of habeas corpus along with instructions. (Mailed 11/22/2019.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) and motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) are denied. It is further ordered that Petitioner must pay the $5 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order (12/21/2019). It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail Petitioner two copies of this order. (Mailed 2 copies on 11/22/2019.) Petitioner must make the necessary arrangements to have a copy of this order attached to the check for the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Clifford W. Miller. (DRM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Clifford W. Miller. (DRM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00673-MMD-WGC. (KR)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Filing Fee was received with Initiating Documents, by Petitioner Clifford W. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 State Court Notice, #3 NV Court of Appeals Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KR)
November 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jack Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?