Slate v. Saul
Plaintiff: Timothy Slate
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Slate re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,. All Defendants. (Metsker, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SSA Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, re ECF No. #1 Complaint, ECF No. #7 Proposed Summons. (KR)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy Slate. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Metsker, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Timothy Slate. (Metsker, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #4 . Attorney John D. Metsker is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. Metsker for Timothy Slate, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/19/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. Metsker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Mills (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5783065) by Plaintiff Timothy Slate. (Mills, Michael)
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) Modified on 11/13/2019 (PAV).
November 13, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LG)
November 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John David Metsker to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/27/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5772462) by Timothy Slate. Proof of service due by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mills, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slate v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Slate
Represented By: John David Metsker
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?