Burke et al v. Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald J Burke and Donald W Burke
Defendant: Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC, Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Companies, LLC, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Integrated Design Build Solutions and Pacific West Service Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00687
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Pacific West Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate William D. Pennington, Other Affiliate Pacific West Service Company, LLC for Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC added. (Rounds, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/24/2020.(Rounds, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No #1 ). Responses due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Donald J Burke, Donald W Burke. (Cordova, Rico)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC, Pacific West Operations, LLC on 12/4/2019 executed by Donald J Burke, Donald W Burke re #1 Complaint,, #6 Summons Issued. (Cordova, Rico)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Companies, LLC, Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Pacific West Operating Group, LLC. (DRM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Defendants Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc., Pacific West Contractors of Nevada, Integrated Design Build Solutions, Pacific West Operations, LLC, and Pacific West Operating Group, LLC by Plaintiffs Donald J Burke, Donald W Burke. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Cordova, Rico)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donald J Burke, Donald W Burke. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cordova, Rico)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5778836) by Donald J Burke, Donald W Burke. Proof of service due by 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cordova, Rico) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J Burke
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Rico Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W Burke
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Rico Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Operating Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Alex J Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Operations, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Alex J Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Contractors of Nevada
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Alex J Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Contractors of California, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Alex J Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Design Build Solutions
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Alex J Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?