Kemp v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Charles Eugene Kemp
Respondent: R. Baker, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv00720
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents R. Baker, Nevada Attorney General. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Goebel, Geordan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Charles Eugene Kemp. (Filed and denied pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.) (DRM)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Charles Eugene Kemp. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.)(E-service to AG 1/14/2020.) (DRM)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - ECF No. #1 IFP Application is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner must file another IFP application, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account; or pay $5.00 filing fee, within 45 days from the date that this order (2/28/2020) accompanied by a copy of this order. (Two copies instant order mailed to P 1/14/2020.) Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a blank IFP application form for incarcerated litigants. (Mailed 1/14/2020.) Clerk shall file the petition and the motion for appointment of counsel, currently at ECF Nos. #1 -1 and #1 -2, respectively. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date that this order is entered (2/28/2020) to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the action as untimely and for being a second and successive petition not authorized by the Court of Appeals. Clerk of Court is directed to add AG, as counsel for Respondents. Clerk shall e-serve upon Respondents a copy of the petition and this order. (E-service 1/14/2020; petition served upon subsequent filing) Respondents' counsel must enter a notice of appearance herein within 21 days of entry of this order (2/4/2020), but no further response will be required from respondents until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against R. Baker, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-CV-00720. (AB)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Charles Eugene Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Motion)(AB)
December 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Baker
Represented By: Geordan Goebel
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Geordan Goebel
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Eugene Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?