American Taekwondo Association, Inc. v. Carson ATA Black Belt Academy, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: American Taekwondo Association, Inc.
Defendant: Shawn Goodner and Carson ATA Black Belt Academy, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00016
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal, #2 Complaint) (KR)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff American Taekwondo Association, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service- Shawn Goodner re #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff American Taekwondo Association, Inc.. (Blazich, Shirley)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Carson ATA Black Belt Academy re #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff American Taekwondo Association, Inc.. (Blazich, Shirley)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (DRM)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Shawn Goodner) (DRM)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Taekwondo Association, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Blazich, Shirley)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5841767) by American Taekwondo Association, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Blazich, Shirley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Taekwondo Association, Inc. v. Carson ATA Black Belt Academy, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Goodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson ATA Black Belt Academy, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Taekwondo Association, Inc.
Represented By: Shirley Blazich
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?