McGuire et al v. Carey et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Neil McGuire and Patrick McGuire
Defendant: Re/Max, LLC, Anne Carey, Jospeh Henry, Antonette Shaw, Carey Trust and Reno, City of
Case Number: 3:2020cv00249
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 86 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants have leave to maintain Exhibit 3 to the opposition to motion to compel (ECF No. 84 ) under seal. In addition, Defendants ha ve leave to redact references to Exhibit 3 and/or the contents of specific information relied upon in the opposition itself. Defendants shall have until Monday, November 23, 2020 to refile a redacted opposition and exhibits, except Exhibit 3, on the public docket. The Court will retain the sealed version of the opposition and Exhibit 3 for its reference in deciding the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re ECF No. 84 Motion to Compel, extending deadline to file a response to 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER approving ECF No. 72 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of RE/MAX Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' ECF No. 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting ECF No. 76 Stipulated Protective Order re confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Stipulation : The McGuires may have until July 31, 2020 to file their amended response to ECF No. 24 Motion. Reply due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - The McGuires' pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 20 ) will be treated as a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, which is GRANTED. The City's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 40 ) is DENIED. The McGuires& #039; Motion for Leave to Propound Limited Discovery is GRANTED. The Parties' mutual request for additional briefing on this matter is GRANTED. The Court will hold an in-person hearing to decided whether to issue a preliminary inju nction in this matter on Monday, August 17, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. (See PDF image for additional details). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that parties shall confer and submit a proposed order by 5:00 PM, July 31, 2020. This proposed order shall comply with the Court's directions stated in the hearing held on July 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike (ECF No. 40 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Stipulation. RE/MAX Defendants' Reply to the Response (ECF No. 35 ) re the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 24 ) is due by July 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 19 ) is DENIED. The Court will hold a hearing regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 20 ) on Tuesday, July 28, 2020 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/13/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting ECF No. 21 Stipulation. Defendants Anne Marie Carey and the Carey Trust's response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 17 ) is due by July 27,2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic case management conference is set for 7/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least f ive (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 20249. The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, July 20, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. 14 Stipulation. Defendants RE/MAX, LLC and RE/MAX HOLDINGS, INC., to file a response to the Amended Verified Complaint (ECF No. 5 ) by June 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. 9 Stipulation : Re/Max LLC and Re/Max Holdings, Inc.'s Answer/response to ECF No. 5 Amended Complaint due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. 7 Stipulation. Defendants City of Reno and Joseph Henry's response to the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 5 ) is due by June 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire et al v. Carey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jospeh Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonette Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Neil McGuire
Represented By: John Neil Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McGuire
Represented By: John Neil Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?