Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Wingfield Springs Community Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv00318
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No #5 Motion to Remove Attorney Darren T Brenner from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to remove attorney Darren T. Brenner from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Morgan, Melanie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Final Judgment Confirming Existence and Validity of Deed of Trust by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Morgan, Melanie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melanie D Morgan on behalf of Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Morgan, Melanie)
June 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group, Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC added. (Lachman, Scott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wingfield Springs Community Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6023515) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Proof of service due by 8/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lachman, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Wingfield Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?