Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S., vs Nature's Bakery, LLC
Plaintiff: Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.
Defendant: Nature's Bakery, LLC and Bella Four Bakery, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Intransia, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00330
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting ECF No. #76 Stipulation. Nature's Bakery shall have up to and including July 20, 2021 to file its opposition. Intransia shall have up to and including August 19, 2021 to file its reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Bustos, Justin)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. #74 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. #71 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/20/2021. Reply due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 29, 2021 Filing 74 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #71 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
June 16, 2021 Filing 73 ERRATA to #72 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Counter Claimant Intransia, LLC. (O'Rourke, Patrick)
June 15, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Counter Claimant Intransia, LLC. Responses due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Affidavit Declaration ISO Motion for Summary Judgment) (O'Rourke, Patrick)
June 14, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment against Nature's Bakery, LLC and Intransia, LLC by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. Responses due by 7/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali Ihsan Yarar, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Declaration of Gabriel T. Bluestone, #15 Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit 3) (Bluestone, Gabriel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 70 ANSWER to #36 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, filed by Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S..(Bluestone, Gabriel)
May 14, 2021 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to #65 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Kwasniewski, David)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. #53 ) is adopted and accepted, and Turk Eximbank's limited objection (ECF No. #54 ) is denied. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #45 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE to #65 Motion for Summary Judgment, by ThirdParty Defendant Intransia, LLC. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Supplement Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to SODF) (O'Rourke, Patrick)
April 12, 2021 Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/12/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Pursuant to the Court's Minute Order granting the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off and Deadlines for Filing Dispositive Motions and Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 64), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Zoom Motion Hearing scheduled for Wednesday, April 14, 2021 at 1:00 pm is VACATED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
April 9, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment NATURE'S BAKERY, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST INTRANSIA, LLC by Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Nature's Bakery, LLC. Responses due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joe Marshall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Bustos, Justin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/31/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.Before the Court is the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-off Date and Deadlines for Filing Dispositive Motions and Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 59). On March 30, 2021, Third-Party Defendant Intransia, LLC filed its Non-Opposition to the Joint Motion (ECF No. 63).Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-off Date and Deadlines for Filing Dispositive Motions and Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 59) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery cut-off date is extended to May 12, 2021, the dispositive motion due date is extended to June 15, 2021, and the joint pretrial order due date is extended to July 16, 2021. In the event dispositive motions are filed, the date for filing the joint pretrial order is suspended to thirty days after the decision on any then-pending dispositive motion. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
March 30, 2021 Filing 63 NON-OPPOSITION to #59 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Counter Claimants Intransia, LLC, Intransia, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Intransia, LLC, Cross Claimants Intransia, LLC, Intransia, LLC, Defendant Intransia, LLC. (O'Rourke, Patrick)
March 30, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis Edward Humphrey on behalf of Counter Claimant Intransia, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Intransia, LLC, Cross Claimant Intransia, LLC, Defendant Intransia, LLC. (Humphrey, Louis)
March 23, 2021 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/23/2021. By Deputy Clerk: E. Garcia.Pending before the Court is the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date and Deadlines for Filing Dispositive Motions and Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 59). The Joint Motion is filed by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat and Natures Bakery. Third Party Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Intransia, LLC did not join the Joint Motion.Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Third Party Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Intransia, LLC shall notify the Court if it objects to the Joint Motion no later than Tuesday, March 30, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Third Party Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Intransia, LLC objects, its response to the Motion shall be filed no later than Monday, April 5, 2021. The Reply shall be due on April 12, 2021. The matter will then be addressed at the April 14, 2021 hearing set in this matter. If Third Party Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Intransia, LLC does not object to the Joint Motion, the Court will enter an Order granting the same on April 6, 2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
March 23, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE Joint, of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Notices of Discovery Disputes by Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S. re #57 Notice (Other), #56 Notice (Other). (Bluestone, Gabriel)
March 22, 2021 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Discovery Cut-Off Date and Submission Dates re #39 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
March 11, 2021 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/11/2021. By Deputy Clerk: E. Garcia.Before the Court is Plaintiff's Second Notice of Discovery Dispute with Defendant (ECF No. 56) and Nature's Bakery's Notice of Discovery Dispute with Plaintiff (ECF No. 57). The Court's calendar is full for the remainder of March due to trials, settlement conferences, and other hearings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that responses to the above titled motions shall be due on or before March 24, 2021. Replies, if any, shall be due March 31, 2021.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing by Zoom shall be held on Wednesday, April 14, 2021 at 1:00 P.M. Pacific Time, before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah.The parties shall contact Elvia Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for the undersigned Magistrate Judge, no later than noon, Pacific Daylight Time, on Monday, April 12, 2021 at Elvia_Garcia@nvd.uscourts.gov to provide email addresses at which parties shall receive Zoom invites. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
March 10, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE NATURE'S BAKERY'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE WITH PLAINTIFF by Nature's Bakery, LLC, Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Kwasniewski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Bustos, Justin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Dispute by Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Bluestone, Gabriel)
March 5, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Objection to #53 Report and Recommendation by Cross Claimant Intransia, LLC. (O'Rourke, Patrick)
February 19, 2021 Filing 54 OBJECTION to #53 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2021. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
February 5, 2021 Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi A.S.' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #45 ) be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED as to Intransia, LLC's Breach of Contract, Indemnification, and Declaratory Relief claims. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED as to the Doe Defendants. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss Intransias LLC's Unjust Enrichment Claim be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 2/5/2021 for font (DRM).
December 28, 2020 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings consistent with her jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:20-cv-0330-LRH-EJY. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 28, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/28/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
December 17, 2020 Filing 50 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Settlement Conference held on 12/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Gabriel Bluestone; Def Counsel: David Kwasnieswski, Justin Bustos, and Patrick O'Rourke; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m. - 1:45 p.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court and the parties confer privately. The parties advise the Court that they are unable to negotiate a settlement at this time. Having discussed the filing of the notice of discovery dispute #49 , counsel advise that Defendant, Nature's Bakery, LLC will supplement their discovery responses within twenty-one (21) days or by no later than Friday, January 8, 2021; therefore, counsel for plaintiff advises that they will file a notice withdrawing the notice of discovery dispute #49 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
December 15, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Discovery Dispute by Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Bluestone, Gabriel)
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to #45 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bluestone, Gabriel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #45 Motion to Dismiss by Cross Claimant Intransia, LLC. Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3) (O'Rourke, Patrick)
October 30, 2020 Filing 46 NATURE'S BAKERY LLC'S ANSWER to #36 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, filed by Nature's Bakery, LLC, Nature's Bakery, LLC.(Bustos, Justin) Modified on 11/2/2020 clarify entry (WJ).
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss #36 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER setting Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. The settlement conference statements may be emailed to chambers by emailing the Court's Judicial Assistant at debra_newman@nvd.uscourts.gov or may be mailed to chambers at 400 S. Virginia St., Room No. 404, Reno, Nevada 89501. The settlement conference statements are due by no later than 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, December 10, 2020.DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting ECF No. #42 Stipulation re ECF No. #39 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 30, 2020 Filing 42 Supplemental Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #39 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DOCKETING ERROR - WRONG CASE - DISREGARD THIS ENTRY ORDERED that on or before November 24, 2020, Plaintiff will either pay the full $400 filing fee, or file a fully complete IFP application as specified herein. Clerk will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/28/2020 to denote docketing error; NEF regenerated (DRM).
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRM)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER on ECF No. #38 Stipulation : Discovery due by 4/12/2021. Motions due by 5/12/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 38 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #37 Miscellaneous Hearing,, by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 Intransia LLC's ANSWER to #19 Third Party Complaint, , First CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Intransia, LLC., First COUNTERCLAIM against Nature's Bakery, LLC by Intransia, LLC. filed by Intransia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10)(O'Rourke, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Gabriel Bluestone and Michael Bluestone; Def Counsel: David Kwasniewski and Justin Bustos; Counsel for Third-Party: Patrick O'Rourke; Recording start and end times: 9:02:25 - 9:21:17; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the parties' joint case management report #33 . Counsel are directed to meet and confer and file an updated discovery plan and scheduling order by no later than Friday, September 23, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Andrew Levine is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney David Kwasniewski is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 33 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT , Discovery Plan, and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nature's Bakery, LLC, Nature's Bakery, LLC. Intransia, LLC served on 8/20/2020; Intransia, LLC served on 8/20/2020. (Bustos, Justin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney David Kwasniewski is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Andrew Levine is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 9/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL - MATTHEW BORDEN by Nature's Bakery, LLC, Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Bustos, Justin)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER approving ECF No. #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew Levine on behalf of Nature's Bakery, LLCand approving Designation of Local Counsel Justin James Bustos. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER approving ECF No. #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David Kwasniewski on behalf of Nature's Bakery, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Justin James Bustos. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Verified Petition to Practice - Andrew Levine by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nature's Bakery, LLC, Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2020. (Bustos, Justin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION Motion for Verified Petion to Practice - David Kwasniewski by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nature's Bakery, LLC, Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2020. (Bustos, Justin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Kwasniewski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/10/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew Borden to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/10/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew Levine to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/10/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Intransia LLC re ECF No. #19 Third Party Complaint, ECF No. #20 Proposed Summons. (KR)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued INTRANSIA, LLC by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nature's Bakery, LLC, Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Bustos, Justin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Intransia, LLC by Nature's Bakery, LLC. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bustos, Justin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, September 2, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Kwasniewski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/30/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew Borden to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/30/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew Levine to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/30/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nature's Bakery, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bustos, Justin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Nature's Bakery, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2020.(Bustos, Justin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Stipulation : Answer/response to Complaint due by 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Nature's Bakery, LLC. (Bustos, Justin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. Nature's Bakery, LLC served on 6/8/2020. (Bluestone, Gabriel)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney M. Zachary Bluestone for Plaintiff, and approving Designation of Local Counsel John C. Boyden, Esq. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gabriel T. Bluestone for Plaintiff, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonh C. Boyden, Esq. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by M. Zachary Bluestone and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John C. Boyden (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6043319) by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Boyden, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel T. Bluestone and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John C. Boyden (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6043294) by Plaintiff Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.. (Boyden, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nature's Bakery, LLC. (AB)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel M. Zachary Bluestone to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/18/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gabriel T. Bluestone to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/18/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TURKIYE IHRACAT KREDI BANKASI, A.S that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Republic of Turkey Undersecretariat of Treasury for TURKIYE IHRACAT KREDI BANKASI, A.S added. (Boyden, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATURE'S BAKERY, LLC fka BELLA FOUR BAKERY, INC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6029622) by TURKIYE IHRACAT KREDI BANKASI, A.S. Proof of service due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyden, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S., vs Nature's Bakery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature's Bakery, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Represented By: Andrew Levine
Represented By: Brooks Todd Westergard
Represented By: David Kwasniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Four Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: David Kwasniewski
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Represented By: Andrew Levine
Represented By: Brooks Todd Westergard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turkiye Ihracat Kredi Bankasi, A.S.
Represented By: M Zachary Bluestone
Represented By: Gabriel T. Bluestone
Represented By: John C. Boyden
Represented By: Gabriel Bluestone
Represented By: Michael Zachary Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Intransia, LLC
Represented By: Louis Edward Humphrey
Represented By: Patrick Sean O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?