Winters et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: George Winters and Peggy Winters
Defendant: DeMartini RV Sales and Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00332
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs and by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Stipulation. The Briefing on the Motion to Transfer (ECF No. #2 ) and Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #11 ) are stayed, pending settlement discussions. The Parties will submit a Status Report to the Court within sixty (60) days regarding the progress of their settlement discussions or re-instatement of a briefing schedule on the pending motions. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Briefing Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by DeMartini RV Sales. (Jensen, Janice)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant DeMartini RV Sales. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jensen, Janice)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #2 Motion, by Plaintiffs George Winters, Peggy Winters. Replies due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Forsberg, Mark)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Thor Motor Coach, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Jensen, Janice)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jensen, Janice)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/5/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/20/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss by Defendants DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Jensen, Janice)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV20-002687, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6030134) by DeMartini RV Sales, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jensen, Janice) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Winters
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Mark Forsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Winters
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Mark Forsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeMartini RV Sales
Represented By: Janice H. Jensen
Represented By: Wayne A Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Janice H. Jensen
Represented By: Wayne A Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?