Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Amarin Pharma, Inc.
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited and Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00421
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 USCA Federal Circuit Notice of Docketing as to ECF No. #13 Notice of Appeal. USCA Federal Circuit case number 2020-2108 assigned. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Judgment by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6099502. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs, re ECF No. #11 Proposed Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. added. (Allen, W.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. West Allen on behalf of Defendants Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Allen, W.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Megan P. Keane to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/28/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael N. Kennedy to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/28/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher N. Sipes to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/28/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (WJ)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:16-cv-02525-MMD-NJK; 2:16-cv-02562-MMD-NJK; 2:18-cv-01596-MMD-NJK by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amarin Corporation plc for Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited added. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6081244) by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. Proof of service due by 10/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals International Limited
Represented By: W. West Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: W. West Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Chelsea Latino
Represented By: Megan Patricia Keane
Represented By: Christopher Neil Sipes
Represented By: Michael Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Chelsea Latino
Represented By: Megan Patricia Keane
Represented By: Christopher Neil Sipes
Represented By: Michael Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?