United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc. v. Straub Construction, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc.
Defendant: Straub Construction, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00426
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc.. (Hansen, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hansen, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Straub Construction, Inc. and Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Western Surety Company) (AB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Straub Construction, Inc., an Alaska corporation, Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6086630) by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc., a California corporation. Proof of service due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Hansen, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc. v. Straub Construction, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straub Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Camblin Steel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Haskin
Represented By: Daniel M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?