Hazel v. Russell et al
Petitioner: Terrance Hazel
Respondent: Russell and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2020cv00428
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the petition (ECF No. #1 ) is dismissed; a certificate of appealability is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case; Clerk directed to send petitioner one copy each of the prisoner application to proceed in forma pauperis and 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and instructions, along with the papers he filed in this action. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/19/2020. (ECF No. #1 Petition, blank IFP prisoner form/instructions and 1983 complaint form/instructions attached hereto for distribution to P). (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 1 Petition, #2 IFP Inmate Packet, #3 Inmate 1983 Complaint form with instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Russell, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00428-LRH-CLB. (LW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5- PAID Receipt No. NVRNO005014) by Terrance Hazel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Image of Envelope) (LW)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazel v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Hazel
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?