Gilbert v. State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Cyrus Gilbert and Cyris Gilbert
Defendant: M. Sullivan, C Alley, M. Minev, Hannah, State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections and A Aranus
Case Number: 3:2020cv00470
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re Mandatory E-Filing for Cases by Inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP (AB)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting Informed Notice to Plaintiff Cyris Gilbert re Financial Certificate and Payment of Filing Fees re ECF No. #3 Order, filed by Non-Party Inmate Kentrell D. Welch. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (AB)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiff will submit a complaint to this Court on or before October 19, 2020. Clerk will send to Plaintiff the approved 1983 form and instructions (Attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Clerk will also send P a copy of his Motion (ECF No. #1 -1). (Attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) ECF No. #1 IFP application is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete IFP application with all three documents specified herein. Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved IFP application form and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Fully complete IFP or $400 filing fee due by October 19, 2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 Form and Instructions, #2 Motion ECF No. 1-1, #3 IFP form and instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cyrus Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Motion for TRO, Injunction) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel. Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Aranus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus Gilbert
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyris Gilbert
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?