Degrado v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Susan Degrado
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Case Number: 3:2020cv00500
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 48 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos. #40 Stipulation and #41 Order, addressed to Attorney Darren McDowell. (LW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 47 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Eric Martin Przybysz, Darren McDowell, and Steven Scott Schulte, to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition was due by 9/30/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by Attorney Darren McDowell. Old: Simon Eddins & Greenstone LLP, 3232 McKinney Ave, Suite 610, Dallas, TX 75204. New: Fears Nachawati Law Firm, PLLC, 5473 Blair Road, Dallas, TX 75231. (LW)
October 5, 2020 Filing 45 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #44 Order addressed to Attorney Darren McDowell. (DRM)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - Mr. McDowell must file a notice informing the Court of his current address by October 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 43 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos. 31 Standing Order, #36 Order, 37 Order, addressed to Darren McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Mail Returned as to ECF No. #36 , #2 Mail Returned as to ECF No. 37 ) (AB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 42 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #30 Order, addressed to Attorney Darren McDowell. (DRM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting ECF No. #40 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. By December 11, 2020 the parties must file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement and discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 15, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION re Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines Stay until December 11, 2020 by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Swanis, Eric)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 9/2/2020 Assign Judges in Civil Case, addressed to Darren McDowell. (KR)
September 10, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2020. ORDER granting #33 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is due by 9/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/9/2020. This matter has been transferred from the Northern district of Texas (ECF No. #28 .) Motions that were pending in the Northern District of Texas (ECF Nos. #3 , #10 ) are denied without prejudice, subject to refiling in the District of Nevada if applicable. Counsel are encouraged to review the District of Nevada's Local Rules and format their motions, responses and replies accordingly. It is ordered that a joint status report is due by 9/30/2020. The joint status report should indicate to the Court whether this matter should be referred for a settlement conference prior to the filing of a joint pretrial order. It should also list the attorneys who will be participating in the case in the District of Nevada. Those attorneys who will not be participating in this district must file a motion to withdraw as counsel for the party or parties. Out of state counsel who will be participating in this case are hereby advised that, pursuant to District of Nevada Local Rule IA 11-2, they will be required to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For counsel's convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register as an Attorney. Verified Petitions are due by 9/30/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER approving ECF No. #34 Stipulation, dismissing without prejudice Defendant McKesson Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc added. (Swanis, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation and Order by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Swanis, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Swanis, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric W. Swanis on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Swanis, Eric)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:20-cv-00500-MMD-BNW. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02696 (from underlying case in Northern District of Texas, Case Number 3:20-cv-01469) Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received electronically with docket entries 1-28. (DRM) Modified on 9/2/2020 to add docket entries received (DRM). Modified on 9/2/2020 to add underlying N.D.Tex. case number 3:20-cv-01469 (DRM).
September 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Memorandum Opinion and Order Grants #18 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Reginald Carlock's case be severed and transferred to the Central Division of the Eastern Division of Arkansas (3:20-cv-2692 case opened); b. Plaintiff Lucretia Gaddis's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (3:20-cv-2693 case opened); c. Plaintiff Earl Lee's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (3:20-cv-2694 case opened); d. Plaintiff Emile Wilkinson-Arter's case be severed and transferred to the Western Division of the Western District of Missouri (3:20-cv-2695 case opend); e. Plaintiff Susan Degrado's case be severed and transferred to the Reno Division of the District of Nevada (3:20-cv-2696 case opened); f. Plaintiff Jacob Williams's case be severed and transferred to the Augusta Division of the Southern District of Georgia (3:20-cv-2697 case opened); g. Plaintiff Brandi Rose's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (3:20-cv-2698 case opened); and h. Plaintiff Anna Parker's case be severed and transferred to the Milwaukee Division of the Eastern District of Wisconsin (3:20-cv-2699 case opened). Plaintiff Lillian Chapa-Mendez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Robert Conley's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs Party Robert Conley terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
August 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #23 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 8/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/3/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams re #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams re #18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Reginald Carlock, Lillian Chapa-Mendez, Robert Conley, Susan Degrado, Lucretia Gaddis, Earl Lee, Anna Parker, Brandi Rose, Emile Wilkinson-Arter, Jacob Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action numbers 3:20-CV-1499-X; 3:20-CV-1469-X; 3:20-CV-1566-X; and 3:20-CV-1500-X are hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/19/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by c.r. bard inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10896335) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 08.30.2016 Romney, Kim deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D-1 Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-2 Chapa-Menza - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-3. 2020-04-07 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-4. 2020-04-07 - Civil Case Information Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-5. 2020-04-08 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-6. 2020-04-08 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-04-08 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-06 - Executed Affidavit of Service to McKesson Corp - 05-01-2020, #14 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-05-22 - Executed Return of Service to C. R. Bard - 05-20-2020, #15 Exhibit(s) D-10 2020-06-04 Executed Return of Service to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. - 05-20-2020) (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Degrado v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Degrado
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?