Susan Baker et al v. Dean Meiling et al
Plaintiff: Jim Kless, Carolyn Noyes, Dorothy D. Shelley, Ray Weismann, James L. Murphy, Kenneth Kuhn, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Martha B. Sisson, Stephen Gran, Joseph Sims, Richard L. Shelley, Anke Hagedorn, Diane Smith, Clint Hubbard, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Donna Hagens, William Noyes, Karen Y. Mallory, Bruce Boston, Larry Smith, Sandra R. Price, Alan P. Wolochuk, Lawrence Lehner, Elaine Grand, Eleanor Weismann, Susan Baker, Stan Canaris, Caroll Burkhardt, Bonnie Bradt, Mary France Gomez, Giovanna Schenini, Roger B. Fosdick, Vicki Mills, Brenda Canaris, Jim Bradt, Jim W. Edwards III, Stanley Groen, Maria Groen, Lee Sadeg, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, David Kane, Leonard A. Semas, Linda Kane, Joan Dietrich, Warren E. Sisson Jr., George Burkhardt, Buel Barnett, Ed Quintal, Kathleen Delle Donne and Kathryn Kuhn
Defendant: Suite B LLC, DSM P GP LLC, Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, Does 1-100, inclusive, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Tiffany Schwartz, Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Meridian Advantage, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., James Proctor and DSM Partners, LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv00518
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF APPEAL by Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk re #106 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Ex Parte Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Kim, Grace)
November 9, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #106 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Ex Parte Motion,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6249403. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Kim, Grace)
November 7, 2020 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #105 Order to Show Cause by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo, #2 Declaration Declaration of Grace Kim, #3 Declaration Declaration of Rosie Cantillo) (Kim, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No. #62 ) is denied. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion regarding the Motion to Remand (ECF No. #72 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Mr. Lazo must show cause, in writing, within 15 days of the date of entry of this order, why the Court should not sanction him for his conduct in Alexander by denying his PHV Application in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 20, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #73 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Lazo, Marc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 103 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Smith, James)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. #91 Motion to Substitute Attorney : Law firm of Santoro Wiltmire substituted in the place and stead of Hodel Wilks, LLP, for Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, and Tiffany Schwartz. (Attorney Oliver J. Pancheri added. Attorney Ashley E. Merlo terminated.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 101 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #67 Motion to Strike,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H) (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #67 Motion to Strike,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 99 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #65 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #65 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to #72 Ex Parte Motion,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to #61 Motion for Judgment by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 13, 2020 Filing 93 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #92 Reply by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y) (Ryan, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to #61 Motion for Judgment by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Nicholas J. Santoro and Oliver J. Pancheri in for Attorney Matt Hodel and Ashley E. Merlo by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 12, 2020 Filing 90 JOINDER to #89 Response by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 9, 2020 Filing 89 RESPONSE to #72 Ex Parte Motion,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Smith, James)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting ECF No. #81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Teague I. Donahey withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 6, 2020 Filing 87 JOINDER to #61 Motion for Judgment by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 6, 2020 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/6/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Petitioner Marc Y. Lazo did not attach a certificate of good standing to his motion for permission to practice pro hac vice (ECF No. #73 .) Petitioner is directed to obtain a recent certificate of good standing and attach the certificate to the original petition (ECF No. #73 .) Using the event "notice of corrected image," Petitioner is directed to file the entire petition and certificate of good standing, and link the corrected image to the original petition (ECF No. #73 .) Petitioner is to comply by 10/20/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 5, 2020 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #61 Motion for Judgment by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Lazo, Marc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE to #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 5, 2020 Filing 83 JOINDER to #78 Memorandum by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 5, 2020 Filing 82 JOINDER to #76 Response, by Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
October 5, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Teague Donahey for Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. (Donahey, Teague)
October 5, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE to #67 Motion to Strike,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Ryan, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 79 RESPONSE to #65 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Ryan, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM to #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 77 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #76 Response, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Ryan, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, Ltd., Suite B LLC. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Ryan, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl.) (Ryan, Robert)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. #74 Stipulation. The Parties shall have until October 16, 2020, to file the Joint Status Report. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extend Deadline to File Joint Status Report to October 16, 2020 re 57 Minute Order,,,,,,, by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Smith, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc Lazo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6190083) by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
September 26, 2020 Filing 72 EX PARTE MOTION re #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Oliver J Pancheri on behalf of Defendants Armstrong Teasdale LLP, Janet Chubb, Tiffany Schwartz. (Pancheri, Oliver)
September 23, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Robert Smith on behalf of Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Smith, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Marc Lazo in support of Motion to Remand re #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 68 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #16 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, #67 Motion to Strike,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Strike #16 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 66 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #65 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, #16 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss #16 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 64 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #61 Motion for Judgment by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X) (Ryan, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 63 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #62 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,,, by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Harris, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Ryan, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 16-572 by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent DSM/MBM Family Trust for Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC added. (Ryan, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert C. Ryan on behalf of Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B LLC. (Ryan, Robert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/16/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. This matter has been transferred from the Central district of California (ECF No. #53 .) Any motions that were pending in the Central District of California are denied without prejudice, subject to refiling in the District of Nevada if applicable. Counsel are encouraged to review the District of Nevada's Local Rules and format their motions, responses and replies accordingly. It is ordered that a joint status report is due by 10/2/2020. The joint status report should indicate to the Court whether this matter should be referred for a discovery plan and scheduling order or a settlement conference prior to the filing of a joint pretrial order. It should also list the attorneys who will be participating in the case in the District of Nevada. Those attorneys who will not be participating in this district must file a motion to withdraw as counsel for the party or parties. Out of state counsel who will be participating in this case are hereby advised that, pursuant to District of Nevada Local Rule IA 11-2, they will be required to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For counsel's convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register as an Attorney. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 14, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew A. Hodel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (LE)
September 14, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ashley E. Merlo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (LE)
September 14, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Marc Y. Lazo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (LE)
September 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
September 14, 2020 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-04335. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received electronically with documents numbered 1-52. (DRM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #13 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court therefore GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Transfer and TRANSFERS this action to the District of Nevada, Reno Division. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING Motion to Transfer and Motion to Remand UNDER SUBMISSION (Docs. #13 , #21 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See FRCP 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 9/11/2020, at 10:30 AM., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 50 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. RYAN re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 49 OBJECTION TO MEILING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDCIAL NOTICE re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY TO MEILING OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY REPLY TO ARMSTRONG TEASDALE'S OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 46 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B, LLC. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 OBJECTIONS Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Marc Lazo Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Second Supplement to Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 43 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo In Support of Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 41 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 40 JOINDER filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP joining in Objection, #39 . (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 39 OBJECTIONS to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 To Declarations filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B, LLC. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 37 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Suite B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Ryan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo in Support of Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Janet L. Chubb in Support of Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Declaration Declaration of Tiffany Schwartz in Support of Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 9, 2020 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation to Continue, #34 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference, scheduled for September 11, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., shall be continued to October 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 11, 2020 to October 9, 2020 Re: Stipulation to Continue, #19 filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merlo, Ashley) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 Supplement to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Supplement to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Supplement to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Merlo, Ashley) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 11, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Marc Lazo In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 Special Motion to Strike filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 11, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 Special Motion to Strike filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 11/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CounterClaim #28 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CounterClaim filed by Plaintiff/CounterClaim Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Advance hearing Date (Doc. #24 ) and (2) CONTINUING Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #13 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiffs' Application is DENIED. Instead, the Court continues the hearing on Defendants' motion to transfer venue from 8/14/2020, at 10:30 AM., to 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY Reply in Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 #24 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 #24 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date on the Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Plaintiffs, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,, Counterclaim,,, #16 filed by Plaintiffs James L. Murphy, Vicki Mills, Stanley Groen, Kathleen Delle Donne, Caroll Burkhardt, Karen Y. Mallory, Linda Kane, Bonnie Bradt, Eleanor Weismann, Elaine Grand, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Martha B. Sisson, Alan P. Wolochuk, Jim Kless, Ed Quintal, Carolyn Noyes, Clint Hubbard, Maria Groen, Larry Smith, William Noyes, Jim Bradt, Sandra R. Price, Christine Eckhout, Kenneth Kuhn, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Ray Weismann, Stephen Gran, Kathryn Kuhn, Susan Baker, David Kane, George Burkhardt, Lee Sadeg, Jim W. Edwards III, Bruce Boston, Richard L. Shelley, Lawrence Lehner, Roger B. Fosdick, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Nancy J. Wolochuk, Dorothy D. Shelley, Brenda Canaris, Buel Barnett, Mary France Gomez, Leonard A. Semas, Anke Hagedorn, Joseph Sims, Stan Canaris, Donna Hagens, Giovanna Schenini, Diane Smith.(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marc Harris, #2 Declaration Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue July 10, 2020 Scheduling Conference to September 11, 2020 #19 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM., shall be continued to 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 10, 2020 to September 11, 2020 filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue July 10, 2020 Scheduling Conference to September 11, 2020)(Merlo, Ashley) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Suite B, LLC. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Suite B, LLC, identifying Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Suite B, LLC, Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, Dean Meiling, DSM P GP LLC, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer)(Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party DSM P GP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party DSM Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Dean Meiling(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Madylon Meiling(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Meiling Family Partners, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Suite B, LLC(pty:dft))(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Request For Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Request For Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Request For Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Request For Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Request For Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Request For Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Request For Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Request For Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Request For Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Request For Judicial Notice)(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo) (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Answer to Complaint filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP.(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-02073 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04335 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, Janet Chubb, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Does 1-100, inclusive, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Meridian Advantage, James Proctor, Tiffany Schwartz, Suite B, LLC, filed by Plaintiffs James L. Murphy, Vicki Mills, Stanley Groen, Caroll Burkhardt, Linda Kane, Elaine Grand, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Martha B. Sisson, Jim Kless, Maria Groen, Christine Eckhout, Karen Y. Mallory, William Noyes, Kathleen Delle Donne, Ray Weismann, Kathryn Kuhn, Alan P. Wolochuk, Lee Sadeg, Richard L. Shelley, Joan Dietrich, Roger B. Fosdick, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Stephen Gran, Buel Barnett, Mary France Gomez, Susan Baker, Lawrence Lehner, David Kane, Kenneth Kuhn, Leonard A. Semas, Jim W. Edwards III, Eleanor Weismann, Clint Hubbard, Anke Hagedorn, Dorothy D. Shelley, Larry Smith, Donna Hagens, Joan Dotson, George Burkhardt, Bruce Boston, Sandra R. Price, Stan Canaris, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Diane Smith, Brenda Canaris, Giovanna Schenini, Jim Bradt, Carolyn Noyes, Ed Quintal, Joseph Sims, Bonnie Bradt. Filed in State Court on 2/6/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, served on May 13, 2020. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Request For Judicial Notice In Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Request For Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Request For Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Request For Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Request For Judicial Notice)(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-02073-JLS-KES; 8:19-cv-00595-JLS-SEM (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, identifying SUSAN BAKER, an individual; BUEL BARNETT, an individual; BRUCE BOSTON, an individual; JIM BRADT, an individual; BONNIE BRADT, an individual; GEORGE BURKHARDT, an individual; CAROLL BURKHARDT, an individual; BRENDA CANARIS, an individual; STAN CANARIS, an individual; CHRISTINE ECKHOUT, an individual; KATHLEEN DELLE DONNE, an individual; JOAN DIETRICH, an individual; JOAN DOTSON, an individual; JIM W. EDWARDS III, an individual; ROGER B. FOSDICK, an individual; FUMIKO FOSDICK-FISHER, an individual; MARY FRANCE GOMEZ, an individual; ELAINE GRAND, an individual; STEPHEN GRAN, an individual; MARIA GROEN, an individual; STANLEY GROEN, an individual; ANKE HAGEDORN, an individual; DONNA HAGENS, an individual; CLINT HUBBARD, an individual; DAVID KANE, an individual; LINDA KANE, an individual; JIM KLESS, an individual; KENNETH KUHN, an individual; KATHRYN KUHN, an individual; LAWRENCE LEHNER, an individual; KAREN Y. MALLORY, an individual; VICKI MILLS, an individual; JAMES L. MURPHY, an individual; CAROLYN NOYES, an individual; WILLIAM NOYES, an individual; SANDRA R. PRICE, an individual; ED QUINTAL, an individual; GIOVANNA SCHENINI, an individual; LEE SADEG, an individual; LEONARD A. SEMAS, an individual; RICHARD L. SHELLEY, an individual; DOROTHY D. SHELLEY, an individual; JOSEPH SIMS, an individual; MARTHA B. SISSON, an individual; WARREN E. SISSON, JR., an individual; LARRY SMITH, an individual; DIANE SMITH, an individual; RAY WEISMANN, an individual; ELEANOR WEISMANN, an individual; ALAN P. WOLOCHUK, an individual; NANCY J. WOLOCHUK, an individual, DEAN MEILING, an individual; MADYLON MEILING, an individual; MEILING FAMILY PARTNERS, LTD; JAMES PROCTOR, an individual; JANET CHUBB, an individual; TIFFANY SCHWARTZ, an individual; CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company; DSM PARTNERS, LP, a Nevada Limited Partnership; DSM P GP LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company; ARMSTRONG TEASDALE, LLP, a Missouri Limited Liability Partnership; MERIDIAN ADVANTAGE, an unknown entity; SUITE B, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV05126 Receipt No: ACACDC-26434522 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Matthew A Hodel added to party Armstrong Teasdale, LLP(pty:dft))(Hodel, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susan Baker et al v. Dean Meiling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suite B LLC
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM P GP LLC
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemeon Surface Technology LLC
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Meiling
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madylon Meiling
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Schwartz
Represented By: Oliver J Pancheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Teasdale LLP
Represented By: Ashley E. Merlo
Represented By: Matthew A Hodel
Represented By: Oliver J Pancheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Chubb
Represented By: Ashley E. Merlo
Represented By: Matthew A Hodel
Represented By: Oliver J Pancheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Advantage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meiling Family Partners, Ltd.
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM Partners, LP
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Joshua Michael Halen
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kless
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Noyes
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy D. Shelley
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Weismann
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Murphy
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kuhn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fumiko Fosdick Fisher
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha B. Sisson
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gran
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sims
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Shelley
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anke Hagedorn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Hubbard
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy J. Wolochuk
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hagens
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Noyes
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Y. Mallory
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Boston
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra R. Price
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan P. Wolochuk
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lehner
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Grand
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Weismann
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Baker
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Canaris
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroll Burkhardt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Bradt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary France Gomez
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Schenini
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger B. Fosdick
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Mills
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Canaris
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bradt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim W. Edwards III
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Groen
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Groen
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Sadeg
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dotson
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Eckhout
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kane
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Semas
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kane
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dietrich
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren E. Sisson Jr.
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Burkhardt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buel Barnett
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Quintal
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Delle Donne
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kuhn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?