United States of America v. $357,965.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $357,965.00 in United States Currency and Daniel Hulsey, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00568
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian Lee Johnson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Gabriel L. Grasso (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6268374) by Defendant $357,965.00 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Attorney Brian L. Johnson) (Grasso, Gabriel)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Publication by United States of America. (Addington, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Stipulation. The filing of a verified claim as set forth in 18 USC, section 983(a)(4)(A), is due by November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed to USAO only (Unable to identify counsel Brian Johnson) - AB)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of USMS Execution of Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America.. (Addington, Gregory)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Acknowledge Receipt of Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem and To Fix Date for Response Thereto by Plaintiff United States of America. (Addington, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS AND WARRANT Of Arrest in Rem for Property and Notice as to $357,965.00 in United States Currency. (LW)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER For Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for Property and Notice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 proposed Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (Addington, Gregory)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against $357,965.00 in United States Currency by United States of America. Proof of service due by 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Addington, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $357,965.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $357,965.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Gabriel L Grasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hulsey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?