Flaherty v. Balaam et al
Plaintiff: Micah Cameron Flaherty
Defendant: Darin Balaam, Judge Barry Breslow, David Neidert and Chris Hicks
Case Number: 3:2020cv00666
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION - Request of Copy Allotment, by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. (KR)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION - Request Court's Local Rules and Procedures, by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. (KR)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to have copies of all documents and motions sent to Plaintiff, including the Motions received today (ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , #5 ), by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. Responses due by 12/23/2020. (AB)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. (AB)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Court to allow additional claims for violations of constitutional rights, claims for relief & injunctions by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. Responses due by 12/23/2020. (AB)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION - Request Court to allow submission of these additional documents including information regarding Case # referenced above by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. Responses due by 12/23/2020. (AB)
December 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (AB)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Micah Cameron Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (AB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Balaam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Balaam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Barry Breslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neidert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Cameron Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?