Jackson v. Daniels
Plaintiff: Charlie D. Jackson
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Case Number: 3:2020cv00705
Filed: December 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Charlie D. Jackson. Responses due by 1/20/2021. (AB)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice. Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, including the information and instructions for the same (Attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by LCC). On or before February 22, 2021, Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file with the Court a completed IFP application, a financial certificate, and a copy of the inmate's prison/jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order, this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. Clerk will retain the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (AB)
December 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charlie D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (AB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie D. Jackson
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?