Ahmad v. Graco Fishing and Tools Inc.
Plaintiff: Tariq Ahmad
Defendant: Graco Fishing and Tools Inc., Jim Fulkerson, Rod Anderson and Pacific Energy & Mining Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00717
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint filed by Jim Fulkerson.(Baytosh, Karen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, by Tariq Ahmad. (Filed by clerk pursuant to ECF No. #21 Order.) (DRM)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall DETACH and FILE the first amended complaint attached to plaintiff's motion as Exhibit 1 (ECF No. #12 -1). Plaintiff's request for default (ECF No. #15 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (ECF No. #20 ) is without merit and is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 First MOTION Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. Responses due by 2/18/2021. (Ahmad, Tariq)
February 3, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #16 . Attorney August B. Hotchkin is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (LE)
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney Andrew M. Bunn is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #16 . Attorney Andrew M. Bunn is advised to review and update his user account information. (no image attached) (LE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jim Fulkerson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Baytosh, Karen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jim Fulkerson. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/15/2021.(Baytosh, Karen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. Responses due by 2/12/2021. (Ahmad, Tariq)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 ERRATA to #12 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (Ahmad, Tariq)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (AB)
January 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed First Amended Complaint) (AB)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #6 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, applicable only to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/12/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tariq Ahmad re ECF No. #2 Summons Issued (see also ECF No. #9 Summons Returned Executed). (AB)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tariq Ahmad re ECF No. #2 Summons Issued. Jim Fulkerson served on 1/8/2021. (AB)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ERRATA to ECF No. #1 Complaint Page 1 caption, by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (DRM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (AB)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. (AB)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Receipt NVRNO-5124 re ECF No. #1 Complaint addressed to Satview Broadband LTD. (AB)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KR)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jim Fulkerson (two copies), re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 - Receipt NVRNO-5124) by Plaintiff Tariq Ahmad. Proof of service due by 3/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KR)
December 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmad v. Graco Fishing and Tools Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tariq Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco Fishing and Tools Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Fulkerson
Represented By: Andrew M Bunn
Represented By: Karen M Baytosh
Represented By: August B Hotchkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Energy & Mining Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?