Johnson v. Pope Francis Paul et al
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Trump, Russell Moons, Biden, Pope Francis Paul, Obama, United Nations, Queen Elizabeth and Russell Moore
Case Number: 3:2021cv00044
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/17/2021) (DRM).
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 COMPLAINT by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Filed and dismissed with prejudice pursuant to ECF No. #12 Order.) (DRM)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that Judge Baldwin's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. #4 ) is accepted and adopted in full. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #1 -1). It is further ordered that Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) is dismissed, with prejudice. It is further ordered that the remaining outstanding motions (ECF Nos. #3 -1, #3 -2, #3 - 3, #3 -4, #3 -5, #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #10 , #11 ) are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly, and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Documents, by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (DRM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Indigency, by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. Responses due by 2/22/2021. (DRM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE - Miscellaneous documents submitted as one, Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies..., by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (DRM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to be Heard by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. Responses due by 2/15/2021. (AB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Squash all statements from all Govt G45 Government Entrapment Cases by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. Responses due by 2/15/2021. (AB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Disclose Statement to be heard soon as possible by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. Responses due by 2/15/2021. (AB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Speedy Trial Act by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. Responses due by 2/15/2021. (AB)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) be granted; that the Clerk file the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1); that the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) be dismissed, with prejudice; that Plaintiff's miscellaneous motions (ECF Nos. #3 -1, #3 -2, #3 -3, #3 -4, #3 -5) be denied as moot; and that this action be closed and that judgment be entered accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Indigency Requirement, #2 Motion for United Nations Ethics Committee, #3 Motion to (illegible), #4 Motion for Speedy Trial Act, #5 Motion to Request Counsel) (DRM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #2 File Stamped copy of Complaint) (DRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Pope Francis Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Moons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope Francis Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Elizabeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?