EnvTech, Inc. v. Rutherford
Plaintiff: EnvTech, Inc.
Defendant: Richard Victor Rutherford
Case Number: 3:2021cv00048
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/18/2021. The court has reviewed the case management report at ECF No. 21 and finds that it is not necessary to hold an initial case management conference at this time. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the courts standing order ECF No. 19. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB)
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff EnvTech, Inc. (Ketner, Sandra)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall meet and confer. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report, as specified herein, by no later than March 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (AB)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. (Rezac, Molly)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. (Martin, Anthony)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff EnvTech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Hall, Anthony)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. (Martin, Anthony)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. #9 Response re ECF No. #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 2/19/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to File Reply re #9 Response, by Plaintiff EnvTech, Inc.. (Ketner, Sandra)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff EnvTech, Inc.. Replies due by 2/18/2021. (Hall, Anthony)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. Replies due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Ex. A - Declaration of RVR, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Answer & Counterclaim) (Martin, Anthony)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. (Martin, Anthony)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Richard Victor Rutherford. Responses due by 2/11/2021. (Martin, Anthony)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Richard Victor Rutherford. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anthony)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EnvTech, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hall, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff EnvTech, Inc.. Responses due by 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Hall, Anthony)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/22/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are reminded that, pursuant to LR 81-1, all pending motions and other requests directed to the state court are automatically denied without prejudice upon removal, and they may be refiled in this court. Motions refiled in this court must include citation to all relevant federal law and must be revised as necessary to comply with this court's rules. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV20-02118, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6338704) by Richard Victor Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Order of Recusal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Case Assignment Notification, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Motion for TRO, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EnvTech, Inc. v. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EnvTech, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Victor Rutherford
Represented By: Molly Malone Rezac
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?