Nelson v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Nelson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00066
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF no. #8 Stipulation. Defendants, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. have to and including March 31, 2021 to file answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request) re #6 Order on Stipulation, by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Stipulation : Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. answer/response to complaint due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/1/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/16/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. added. (Salmonson, Dana)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 1st Judicial District Court, Stoney County, Case Number 20-TRT 00004 1E, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6350091) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Collective and Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Service, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Salmonson, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Joshua R. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?