United States of America for the use of Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc. et al v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC. and NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC.
Defendant: Winsear Construction, LLC, The Guarantee Company of North America USA and Winspear Construction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00074
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Winspear Construction, LLC and The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Guarantee Company of North America USA) (AB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re The Guarantee Company of North America USA by Plaintiffs Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc., United States of America for the use of Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc.. (Mannelly, Philip)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re Winspear Construction, LLC by Plaintiffs Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc., United States of America for the use of Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc.. (Mannelly, Philip)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Howard D. McKibben for all further proceedings consistent to his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00074-HDM-CLB. (no image attached) (LE)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/17/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC., United States of America for the use of NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mannelly, Philip)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Guarantee Company of North America USA, Winsear Construction, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6360025) by United States of America for the use of NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC., NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC.. Proof of service due by 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mannelly, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Northern Nevada Concrete, Inc. et al v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winsear Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winspear Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC.
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHERN NEVADA CONCRETE, INC.
Represented By: Philip Mannelly
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?