Allen v. The State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Gene Anthony Harry Allen
Defendant: John Doe, The State of Nevada and Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2021cv00089
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Reassign Judges and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Case to be transferred to Unofficial Northern District of Nevada per CRD - DRS)
February 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00701. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (JQC)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Case transferred to District of Nevada. Case extracted via ecf. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/12/2021. (Greene, Donna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants by Gene Anthony Harry Allen. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Authorization (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 2/10/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gene Anthony Harry Allen. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Nevada Department of Corrections, The State of Nevada, filed by Gene Anthony Harry Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/12/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. The State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Anthony Harry Allen
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?