In re: 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood
Plaintiff: Gladis Estrada
Defendant: City of Reno
In Re: 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood
Case Number: 3:2021cv00093
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood. Replies due by 4/26/2021. (Doyle, Roger)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #2 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Gladis Estrada. Replies due by 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Doyle, Kerry)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood (Doyle, Kerry)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Reno. Responses due by 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (McKean, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Request for Judicial Notice, by Defendant City of Reno. (McKean, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant City of Reno. (McKean, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kerry S. Doyle on behalf of Plaintiff Estrada In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood. (Doyle, Kerry) Modified on 3/10/2021 add plaintiff (WJ).
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Roger S. Doyle on behalf of plaintiff Estrada In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood. (Doyle, Roger) Modified on 3/10/2021 add plaintiff (WJ).
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #2 Motion to Dismiss, by City of Reno In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (McKean, William) Modified on 3/10/2021 who filed the document. (WJ).
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Reno In Re 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood. Responses due by 3/23/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/23/2021. (McKean, William) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/10/2021 add who filed. (WJ).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Master docket and case file opened under "In re: 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood" case number 3:21-cv-00093-MMD-CLB to be used for purpose of discovery and pretrial matters. The court orders pretrial consolidation of: CLEOUS: 3:20-CV-0585-MMD-CLBNOVAK: 3:20-CV-0586-MMD-CLBSIMINOE: 3:20-CV-0595-MMD-CLBBERNS: 3:20-CV-0649-MMD-CLBBUSHY: 3:20-CV-0650-MMD-CLBLOFFER: 3:20-CV-0711-MMD-CLBDEKKER: 3:20-CV-0712-MMD-CLBNAUMAN: 3:20-CV-0713-MMD-CLBSCHUTTE: 3:20-CV-0714-MMD-CLBSPENCER: 3:20-CV-0715-MMD-CLBLAMAS-AGUILAR: 3:21-CV-0011-MMD-CLBCONLIN: 3:21-CV-0012-MMD-CLBDONOHUE: 3:21-CV-0014-MMD-CLBDUTCHER: 3:21-CV-0015-MMD-CLBASSEM. OF GOD: 3:21-CV-0016-MMD-CLBNEVAREZ: 3:21-CV-0017-MMD-CLBPEARSON: 3:21-CV-0021-MMD-CLBROSS: 3:21-CV-0022-MMD-CLBLONG: 3:21-CV-0023-MMD-CLBLAUNER: 3:21-CV-0026-MMD-CLBPOOL: 3:21-CV-0029-MMD-CLBHUGHETT: 3:21-CV-0036-MMD-CLBSOTELO: 3:21-CV-0037-MMD-CLB BERRY: 3:21-CV-0038-MMD-CLBHALL: 3:21-CV-0040-MMD-CLBAll motions to dismiss in member cases are denied without prejudice. Defendants may file two motions to dismiss (see order for specifics).Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/21See order for further details and instructions. Motion due by 3/9/2021. Motion due by 3/25/2021. Joint Case Management Report due by 4/8/2021. Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 2017 Lemmon Valley Flood
Represented By: Jonathan David Shipman
Represented By: Kerry S. Doyle
Represented By: Luke Andrew Busby
Represented By: Chandeni K Sendall
Represented By: William J. McKean
Represented By: Roger S. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladis Estrada
Represented By: Luke Andrew Busby
Represented By: Kerry S. Doyle
Represented By: Roger S. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Reno
Represented By: Jonathan David Shipman
Represented By: Chandeni K Sendall
Represented By: William J. McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?