VW Credit Inc. v. Muscle Motors Auto Sales
Plaintiff: VW Credit Inc.
Defendant: Muscle Motors Auto Sales
Case Number: 3:2021cv00113
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VW Credit Inc. re #11 Summons Issued, #10 Amended Complaint. Muscle Motors Auto Sales served on 4/27/2021. (Ferguson, Sarah)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Muscle Motors Auto Sales. (SC)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Muscle Motors Auto Sales by VW Credit Inc.. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ferguson, Sarah)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Nicholas A., Duston is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 4/12/2021 COMPLIED (WJ).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas A. Duston for VW Credit, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Sarah A. Ferguson. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/5/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas A. Duston and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sarah A. Ferguson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6431420) by Plaintiff VW Credit Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attempt to Comply with Local Rule IA 11-2 by VW Credit Inc. re 2 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,,. (Ferguson, Sarah)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VW Credit Inc.. Muscle Motors Auto Sales served on 3/18/2021. (Ferguson, Sarah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by VW Credit Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Parent VW Credit Inc., Other Affiliate VW Credit Leading LTD for VW Credit Inc. added. (Ferguson, Sarah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Muscle Motors Auto Sales. (AB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Nicholas A. Duston to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/23/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Muscle Motors Auto Sales (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6397827) by VW Credit Inc.. Proof of service due by 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Ferguson, Sarah) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 9, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VW Credit Inc. v. Muscle Motors Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VW Credit Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Nicholas A. Duston
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Represented By: Nicholas A Duston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muscle Motors Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?