Baker Ranches, Inc. et al v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Judee Schaley, Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge and Zane Jordan
Defendant: James Woolsey, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, Shawn Benge and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 3:2021cv00150
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. Responses due by 6/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Lord, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9) (Negri, David)
May 13, 2021 Filing 33 APPENDIX Supplement to Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion to Remand and Motion for Order to Show Cause to #31 Reply, #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, #32 Reply by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45 (Supplemental Declaration of Craig Baker), #2 Exhibit 46 (Supplemental Declaration of Debbie Leonard), #3 Exhibit 47 (Certificate of Record), #4 Exhibit 48 (Portions of State Engineer Baker-Lehman Adjudication File Part 1), #5 Exhibit 48 (Portions of State Engineer Baker-Lehman Adjudication File Part 2), #6 Exhibit 49 (District Court Docket Sheet, Case No. 2874), #7 Exhibit 50 (Portion of Federal Register), #8 Exhibit 51 (Aerial Image)) (Leonard, Debbie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Leonard, Debbie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Leonard, Debbie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, #25 Response, by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Debbie Leonard)) (Leonard, Debbie)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting ECF No. #27 Stipulation to Extend Time : Replies to ECF Nos. #25 , #26 Responses re ECF Nos. #8 Motion to Remand, #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, due by 5/13/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 28 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Leonard, Debbie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 27 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiffs to File Replies in Support of Their Motion to Remand and Motion for Order to Show Cause re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, #25 Response, #26 Response, #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Leonard, Debbie)
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. Replies due by 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Lord, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Negri, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. Replies due by 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Lord, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Negri, David)
April 22, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zane Jordan, David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Baker Ranches, Inc., Judee Schaley. Shawn Benge served on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zane Jordan, David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Baker Ranches, Inc., Judee Schaley. National Park Service served on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zane Jordan, David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Baker Ranches, Inc., Judee Schaley. James Woolsey served on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zane Jordan, David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Baker Ranches, Inc., Judee Schaley. United States Department of the Interior served on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zane Jordan, David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Baker Ranches, Inc., Judee Schaley. Deb Haaland served on 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 Motion to Extend Time : Defendants' Response to ECF No. #8 Motion to Remand to State Court due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Motion to Extend Time : Defendants' Response to ECF No. #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. (Negri, David)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. (Negri, David)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. (Negri, David)
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00150-GMN-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/8/2021. By Judicial Assistant: Elaine Muhlebach. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/6/2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Response to Complaint (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall have to and including May 28, 2021, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Baker Ranches, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Leonard, Debbie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 APPENDIX of Exhibits in Support of Motion to Remand and Motion for Order to Show Cause to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, #9 Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits Part 2, #2 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits Part 3, #3 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits Part 4, #4 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits Part 5) (Leonard, Debbie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Violating Court Decree by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Leonard, Debbie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs Baker Ranches, Inc., David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge, Zane Jordan, Judee Schaley. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Leonard, Debbie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. (Negri, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to clerical error of assigning District Judge Robert C. Jones to this case it is now randomly reassigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00150-LRH-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:18-cv-00261-RFB-CLB by Defendants Shawn Benge, Deb Haaland, National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, James Woolsey. (Negri, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00150-RCJ-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Chief Judge for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/2/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/17/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Seventh Judicial District White Pine County, Case Number cv-2103035, by US Dept. of Interior, Shawn Benge, James Woolsey, National Park Service, Deb Haaland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Negri, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker Ranches, Inc. et al v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Woolsey
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David L. Negri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David L. Negri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David L. Negri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Benge
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David L. Negri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David L. Negri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judee Schaley
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Ranches, Inc.
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David John Eldridge and Ruth Eldridge
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Jordan
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?