United States of America v. Colt Government Pistol CAL:45 SN:SCGA5964 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Glock Inc. Unknown Type Reciever/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:GKX284, Smith & Wesson 327 Revolver CAL:357 SN:SWT1716, Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ066, Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0015-69115, Benelli, S. PA M4 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:Y113310P19, Smith & Wesson 686 Revolver CAL:357 SN:DMV6333, Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ005, Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0599900, Henry Repeating Rifle Company H006M Big Boy Rifle CAL:357 SN:BB0028142M, Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SAM7SF Rifle CAL:762 SN:XM532032, Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:829-86210, Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SLR-107R Rifle CAL:762 SN:AE602439 and Colt Government Pistol CAL:45 SN:SCGA5964
Case Number: 3:2021cv00164
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONSES and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Smith & Wesson 686 Revolver CAL:357 SN:DMV6333, #2 Smith & Wesson 327 Revolver CAL:357 SN:SWT1716, #3 Henry Repeating Rifle Company H006M Big Boy Rifle CAL:357 SN:BB0028142M, #4 Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:GKX284, #5 Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ005, #6 Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ066, #7 Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0015-69115, #8 Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:829-86210, #9 Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SLR-107R Rifle CAL:762 SN:AE602439, #10 Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SAM7SF Rifle CAL:762 SN:XM532032, #11 Benelli, S. PA M4 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:Y113310P19, #12 Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0599900) (AB)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Summonses and Warrants of Arrest in Rem for the Property and Notice re ECF No. #3 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Colt Government Pistol CAL:45 SN:SCGA5964, #2 Summons Smith & Wesson 686 Revolver CAL:357 SN:DMV6333, #3 Summons Smith & Wesson 327 Revolver CAL:357 SN:SWT1716, #4 Summons Henry Repeating Rifle Company H006M Big Boy Rifle CAL:357 SN:BB0028142M, #5 Summons Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:GKX284, #6 Summons Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ005, #7 Summons Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ066, #8 Summons Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0015-69115, #9 Summons Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:829-86210, #10 Summons Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SLR-107R Rifle CAL:762 SN:AE602439, #11 Summons Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SAM7SF Rifle CAL:762 SN:XM532032, #12 Summons Benelli, S. PA M4 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:Y113310P19, #13 Summons Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0599900) (Blum, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Blum, James)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against All Defendants by United States of America. Proof of service due by 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blum, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Colt Government Pistol CAL:45 SN:SCGA5964 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock Inc. Unknown Type Reciever/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:GKX284
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson 327 Revolver CAL:357 SN:SWT1716
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ066
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0015-69115
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benelli, S. PA M4 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:Y113310P19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson 686 Revolver CAL:357 SN:DMV6333
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock Inc. Unknown Type Receiver/Frame CAL:Unknown SN:BGCZ005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0599900
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Repeating Rifle Company H006M Big Boy Rifle CAL:357 SN:BB0028142M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SAM7SF Rifle CAL:762 SN:XM532032
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:829-86210
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SLR-107R Rifle CAL:762 SN:AE602439
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Government Pistol CAL:45 SN:SCGA5964
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Alexander Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?