Sullivan v. Russell et al
Petitioner: Keith William Sullivan
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Perry Russell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00196
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geordan Goebel on behalf of Respondents Nevada Attorney General, Perry Russell. (Goebel, Geordan)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Keith William Sullivan. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order. E-service to AG.) (DRM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the clerk shall file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus, currently in the docket at ECF No. #1 -1. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents. Clerk shall provide copies of this order and all prior filings to the AG in a manner consistent with the clerk's current practice, such as regeneration of notices of electronic filing to the office of the AG only. (NEFs ECF Nos. 1-5 regenerated to AG on 6/4/2021.) Respondents must file a response to the petition within 60 days of entry of this order (8/3/2021). Paper copies of any e-filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the court The motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVRNO005252 (no image attached) (AB)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Keith William Sullivan. (DRM)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date that this order is entered to have the filing fee of $5.00 sent to the Clerk of the Court. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action. Clerk shall send Petitioner two copies of this order (second copy attached hereto for distribution to Petitioner by NNCC). Petitioner must make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Second Copy of Order for Petitioner) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Perry Russell, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:21-cv-00196. (AB)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Keith William Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (AB)
April 28, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith William Sullivan
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Geordan Goebel
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Perry Russell
Represented By: Geordan Goebel
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?