Onas, III et al v. Lennar Reno, LLC dba Lennar Homes
Plaintiff: Nicole Papke, Latricia Lord, Nicole Vanvalkenburg, Heather R Oneal-Onas and Salvador A. Onas, III
Defendant: Lennar Reno, LLC doing business as Lennar Homes
Case Number: 3:2021cv00283
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re ECF No. #15 Status Report : Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Joint Stmt Regarding Case Status, Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Latricia Lord, Salvador A. Onas, III, Heather R Oneal-Onas, Nicole Papke. (Segerblom, Eva)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' ECF No. #9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiffs Latricia Lord, Salvador A. Onas, III, Heather R Oneal-Onas, Nicole Papke. (Segerblom, Eva)
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Lennar Reno, LLC. Replies due by 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Durham, Matthew)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Lennar Reno, LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Latricia Lord, Salvador A. Onas, III, Heather R Oneal-Onas, Nicole Papke. Responses due by 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Segerblom, Eva)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lennar Reno, LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than August 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lennar Reno, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/15/2021.(Durham, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lennar Reno, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Lennar Reno, LLC, Corporate Parent Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate Lennar Pacific Properties Management, Inc. for Lennar Reno, LLC added. (Durham, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Washoe, Case Number CV21-00932, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6535123) by Lennar Reno, LLC dba Lennar Homes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Durham, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onas, III et al v. Lennar Reno, LLC dba Lennar Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Papke
Represented By: Ardea G. Canepa
Represented By: Eva Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Lord
Represented By: Ardea G. Canepa
Represented By: Eva Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Vanvalkenburg
Represented By: Ardea G. Canepa
Represented By: Eva Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather R Oneal-Onas
Represented By: Ardea G. Canepa
Represented By: Eva Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador A. Onas, III
Represented By: Ardea G. Canepa
Represented By: Eva Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Reno, LLC doing business as Lennar Homes
Represented By: Matthew L. Durham
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?