WearForce Pty Ltd v. Talon Engineering, SDN BHD
Plaintiff: WearForce Pty Ltd
Defendant: Talon Engineering, SDN BHD
Case Number: 3:2021cv00284
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WearForce Pty Ltd re #6 Summons Issued. Talon Engineering, SDN BHD waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 19, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Glenn E. Forbis is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 7/21/2021 COMPLIED (WJ).
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney J. Bradley Luchsinger is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 7/19/2021 COMPLIED (WJ).
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Glenn E. Forbis is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for J. Bradley Luchsinger, representing Wearforce, Pty Ltd. and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Steven Caloiaro. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/13/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Glenn Forbis, representing Wearforce, Pty Ltd. and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Steven Caloiaro. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/13/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, by Plaintiff WearForce Pty Ltd. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff WearForce Pty Ltd. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff WearForce Pty Ltd. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #9 J. Bradley Luchsinger's Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition and Glen Forbis's #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Local counsel Steven Caloiaro did not sign either document to accept appointment as local counsel. Local Counsel is advised to sign the documents and re-file each petition using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category. Each corrected image must be linked to its related petition (ECF No. #9 for Mr. Luchsinger and ECF No. #8 for Mr. Forbis.) (no image attached) (PAV)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by J. Bradley Luchsinger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Steven A. Caloiaro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6551087) by Plaintiff WearForce Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caloiaro, Steven)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Glenn E. Forbis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Steven A. Caloiaro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6551058) by Plaintiff WearForce Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caloiaro, Steven)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Talon Engineering, SDN BHD, re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KR)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel J. Bradley Luchsinger to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/9/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Glenn E. Forbis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/9/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (WJ)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by WearForce Pty Ltd. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Caloiaro, Steven)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Talon Engineering, SDN BHD (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6535232) by WearForce Pty Ltd. Proof of service due by 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons) (Caloiaro, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Attachment 13 replaced on 6/25/2021) (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WearForce Pty Ltd v. Talon Engineering, SDN BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WearForce Pty Ltd
Represented By: Steven Anthony Caloiaro
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Represented By: J. Bradley Luchsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talon Engineering, SDN BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?