State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America ex rel United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America ex rel United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv00297
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for all further proceedings. New case number 3:21-cv-00297-LRH-WGC. (no image attached) (LE)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued as to USA. United States of America ex rel United States Postal Service served on 7/21/2021. (O'Gorman-Hoyt, Liam)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Derek Kopecki, Other Affiliate Madisyn Kopecki for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company added. (O'Gorman-Hoyt, Liam)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (DRM)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 8/4/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (DRM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. Filing fee paid pursuant to EDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to United States of America) (SC)
July 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America ex rel United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Liam O'Gorman-Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America ex rel United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?