Slate v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Timothy Slate
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00298
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SC)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Cheung, Allison)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 DOCKETING ERROR; DISREGARD ENTRY: NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 8/18/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (SC) Modified on 7/28/2021 to note entry as an error. NEF regenerated (SC).
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy Slate. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Metsker, John)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Slate. All Defendants. (Metsker, John)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (SMR)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. Metsker for Timothy Slate and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael C. Mills. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/20/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Timothy Slate. (Mills, Michael)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. Metsker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Mills (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6562910) by Plaintiff Timothy Slate. (Mills, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John Metsker to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/29/2021. (no image attached) (LE)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6556138) by Timothy Slate. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Modified on 8/6/2021 re ECF No. #11 (SC).
July 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slate v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Slate
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Represented By: John David Metsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?