Bronzie v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Bronzie
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Miguel Calderdon and Miguel Calderon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00299
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (SMR)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/9/2022. Motions due by 4/8/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Douglas Bronzie. (Throop, Julie)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Stipulation to Maintain Jurisdiction and Venue in the United States District Court District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/31/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO MAINTAIN JURISDICTION AND VENUE by Plaintiff Douglas Bronzie.. (Throop, Julie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 ADDENDUM to #6 Answer to Complaint, by Defendants Miguel Calderon, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Odou, Joel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Miguel Calderon, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Odou, Joel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Miguel Calderon, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/23/2021.(Odou, Joel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Bronzie re #3 Summons Issued,. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC served on 7/21/2021. (Throop, Julie)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Bronzie re #3 Summons Issued,. Miguel Calderon served on 7/17/2021. (Throop, Julie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, and as to Miguel Calderon. (Attachments: #1 as to Miguel Calderdon) (DRM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2021); to correct spelling of P Calderon's name misspelled on proposed summons; NEF regenerated (DRM).
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Douglas Bronzie. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Throop, Julie)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Calderdon, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6556395) by Douglas Bronzie. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Swift, #3 Summons Miguel Calderon) (Throop, Julie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronzie v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bronzie
Represented By: Julie McGrath Throop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Calderdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Calderon
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?