Nevett v. Renown Health
Plaintiff: Emily Nevett and Bonnie Noble
Defendant: Renown Health
Case Number: 3:2021cv00319
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request). Plaintiffs' opposition to ECF No. #13 Motion to Dismiss is extended up to and including, October 13, 2021. Defendant's reply is due on or before November 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #13 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Renown Health. (Dickinson, Diana)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint by Defendant Renown Health. Responses due by 9/22/2021. (Dickinson, Diana)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Joinder by Emily Nevett, Bonnie Noble. (Buck, Joshua)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Renown Health. (Kim, Emil)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WITHDRAWAL of #6 Motion to Remand to State Court,,, by Plaintiff Emily Nevett. (Jones, Leah)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Renown Health by Emily Nevett. Adds new parties. (Jones, Leah)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #7 Stipulation : Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of entry ofthis Order (9/1/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to File Plaintiff's Proposed First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emily Nevett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Buck, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Emily Nevett. Responses due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Buck, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email dated June 7, 2021, #3 Exhibit 2 - Email dated June 10, 2021, #4 Exhibit 3 - Email dated June 22, 2021, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Limited Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Limited Opposition, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Request for Submission, #8 Exhibit 7 - Email dated July 26, 2021, #9 Exhibit 8 - Defense Counsel's Email dated August 11, 2021, #10 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Counsel's Email dated August 11, 2021) (Buck, Joshua)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Renown Health. (Dickinson, Diana)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISREGARD ENTRY. ISSUED IN ERROR. MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR) Modified on 7/26/2021 to note was entered in error. NEF regenerated on 7/26/2021 (SMR).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Renown Health. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thomas, Ethan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court - Washoe County, Case Number CV20-00583, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6569356) by Renown Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G) (Thomas, Ethan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevett v. Renown Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Nevett
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Joshua R. Hendrickson
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Noble
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renown Health
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Represented By: Diana Dickinson
Represented By: Emil S Kim
Represented By: Ethan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?